Joe Hand Promotions, Inc v. JAROUR et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc
Defendant: Istanbul Cafe LLC and Tareq JAROUR
Case Number: 0:2019cv61109
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James I Cohn
Referring Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Istanbul Cafe LLC, Tareq JAROUR. (lbc)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc re #1 Complaint filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc (Kaniuk, Ronald)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING CALENDAR CALL AND TRIAL DATE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE FOR SCHEDULING MATTERS AND PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS: ( Jury Trial set for 1/13/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., Calendar Call set for 1/9/2020 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 5/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Notice of Filing: Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kaniuk, Ronald)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (cds)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (cds)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11607646, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(Kaniuk, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc v. JAROUR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc
Represented By: Ronald Scott Kaniuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Istanbul Cafe LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tareq JAROUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?