Southam v. Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.

Plaintiff: James Lucas Southam
Defendant: Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv61255
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER STAYING CASE. Order granting #10 Motion to Stay. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Stay this action pending the conclusion of the Muransky v. Godiva Chocolatier appeal in the Eleventh Circuit by Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kosches, Jordan)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings. Judge Beth Bloom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (bms)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to the Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than 7/2/2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/5/2019. (laa)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kosches, Jordan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jordan Scott Kosches on behalf of Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.. Attorney Jordan Scott Kosches added to party Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.(pty:dft). (Kosches, Jordan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by James Lucas Southam. Red Wing Brands of America, Inc. served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Executed)(Lusskin, Bret)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.. (jao) (Main Document 3 replaced with CORRECTED image on 5/20/2019) (jao). Modified on 5/20/2019 (jao).
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11656643, filed by James Lucas Southam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Visa Best Practices for Primary Account Number Storage and Truncation, #2 Exhibit B - American Express Merchant Requirements, #3 Exhibit C - Mastercard Acceptance Procedures, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s) for Issuance to Defendant Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.)(Lusskin, Bret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southam v. Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Scott Kosches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lucas Southam
Represented By: Bret Leon Lusskin, Jr.
Represented By: Scott David Owens
Represented By: Keith James Keogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?