Mercius v. Synovus Bank

Plaintiff: Dave Mercius
Defendant: Synovus Bank
Case Number: 0:2019cv61257
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 Transmittal Letter Sent with Order to: 17th Judicial Circuit in and for Broward County Florida. State Court Case Number: 19005203-COWE (Attachments: #1 Order) (mee)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Closing Case. Motions terminated: #7 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #6 Notice (Other) filed by Synovus Bank. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT REGARDING Removal Status by Synovus Bank (Drushal, Amy)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Synovus Bank identifying Corporate Parent Synovus Financial Corp., Corporate Parent Synovus Bank for Synovus Bank (Drushal, Amy)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES; Counsel for the removing party is directed to file and serve a Removal Status Report no later than June 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES; (Joint Scheduling Report & certificates of interested parties due by 06/18/2019) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 06/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #6 Notice (Other) by Synovus Bank. Responses due by 6/3/2019 (Drushal, Amy)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Synovus Bank re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Drushal, Amy)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. State Court Records not included. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the State Court Records attached within 24 hours. (ebz)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Synovus Bank Civil C (Drushal, Amy)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (ebz)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11655660, filed by Synovus Bank.(Drushal, Amy) No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer has been attached. (ebz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercius v. Synovus Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synovus Bank
Represented By: Amy L. Drushal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Mercius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?