Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, et al. v. Atlas Leasing Inc. et al
Respondent: OMI Florida LLC, Jacob Bengio, Norman Ginsparg, 931121 North Shore LLC, Atlas Leasing Inc. and Mahair Investments, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv61261
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 7/2/2019. (bj00)
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by OMI Florida LLC. Attorney Guy Austin Rasco added to party OMI Florida LLC(pty:res). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rasco, Guy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, #19 Response/Reply (Other) Movants' Reply in Support of Petition to Enforce Subpoena to Norman Ginsparg by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Curtis, Oliver)
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos re #3 Affidavit,,,,,,,, #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed U.S. Registered Mail Return Receipt) (Curtis, Oliver)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Norman Ginsparg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Shapiro, Lyle)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 6/21/2019. (bj00)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, 14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time Joint Motion to Extend Respondent Jacob Bengio's Deadline to Respond to Movants' Petition to Enforce Third-Party Subpoenas by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curtis, Oliver)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 6/14/2019. (bj00)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Norman Ginsparg. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Lyle)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 6/13/2019. (bj00)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition to Enforce Non Party Subpoenas re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Jacob Bengio. Responses due by 6/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burger, Alan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to #7 Response to Motion, Movants' Reply in Support of Petition to Enforce Subpoena to Atlas Leasing, Inc. by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Composite Exhibit D)(Curtis, Oliver)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 6/7/2019. (bj00)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Norman Ginsparg. Attorney Lyle Eric Shapiro added to party Norman Ginsparg(pty:res). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Lyle)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District. (Summonses Not Issued by Clerk) SEE DE #8 Image (ail)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, Notice of Filing Affidavits of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Exhibit A - Affidavits of Service)) (Curtis, Oliver)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time 2 weeks re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, filed by Atlas Leasing Inc.. Attorney Bruce David Green added to party Atlas Leasing Inc.(pty:res). Replies due by 6/7/2019. (Green, Bruce)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 5/30/2019. (bj00)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time 2 weeks re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Jacob Bengio. Attorney Alan Michael Burger added to party Jacob Bengio(pty:res). Responses due by 6/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion Ext. of Time)(Burger, Alan)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District Movants' Petition to Enforce Non-Party Subpoenas.. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)Document Replaced on 5/23/2019 (ail).
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Lance J. Kalik, Esq.. re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, Declaration of Lance J. Kalik, Esq. in Support of the Drinker Movants' Motion to Enforce Subpoenas Issued from the District of New Jersey Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Exh. A - Complaint), #2 Exhibit (Exh. B - Marathon Report), #3 Exhibit (Exh. C - DBR Answer Doc. No. 17), #4 Exhibit (Exh. D - Notice of Subpoenas), #5 Exhibit (Exh. E - Letter to Kalik 00382567 objecting to subpoenas), #6 Exhibit (Exh. F - Email from Kalik 3.26.2019), #7 Exhibit (Exh. G - Mahair Investments LLC - 2019-02-26 13.40.10), #8 Exhibit (Exh. H - Atlas Leasing, Inc. 2019-02-26 13.41.31), #9 Exhibit (Exh. I - Norman Ginsparg - 2019-02-26 13.33.54), #10 Exhibit (Exh. J - Jacob Bengio - 2019-02-26 13.30.41), #11 Exhibit (Exh. K - OMI Florida LLC - 2019-02-26 13.46.36), #12 Exhibit (Exh. L - 931121 North Shore LLC - 2019-02-26 13.47.55), #13 Exhibit (Exh. M - Joint Letter filed in Underlying Action), #14 Exhibit (Exh. N - Bengio Ginsparg - Letter 3-25-19), #15 Exhibit (Exh. O - Riker response to Ginsparg-Bengio), #16 Exhibit (Exh. P - Ginsparg objection letter), #17 Exhibit (Exh. Q - Bengo Objection Letter), #18 Exhibit (Exh. R - Third Superseding Indictment), #19 Exhibit (Exh. S - Verdict Sheet), #20 Exhibit (Exh. T - Petron1), #21 Exhibit (Exh. U - Petron2), #22 Exhibit (Exh. V - Mahair Check), #23 Exhibit (Exh. W - JNL Management - Org Docs), #24 Exhibit (Exh. X - TGWC Corporate Documents), #25 Exhibit (Exh. Y - Detention Transcript Part 2), #26 Exhibit (Exh. Z - Law360 Article regarding Nelson Salazar testimony), #27 Exhibit (Exh. AA - Crime Scene sign-in-log), #28 Exhibit (Exh. BB - Government's Notice of 404 (b), #29 Exhibit (Exh. CC - California Complaint), #30 Exhibit (Exh. DD - Plaintiffs' responses to DBR-Pozos 1st set of interrogatories - 00385076))(Curtis, Oliver)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District Movants' Petition to Enforce Non-Party Subpoenas. Filing fee $47.00 receipt number 113C-11657279, filed by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, Antonio Pozos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Curtis, Oliver)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP, et al. v. Atlas Leasing Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: OMI Florida LLC
Represented By: Guy Austin Rasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jacob Bengio
Represented By: Alan Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Norman Ginsparg
Represented By: Lyle Eric Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: 931121 North Shore LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Atlas Leasing Inc.
Represented By: Bruce David Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mahair Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?