Todman v. Penske Logistics LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Todman
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P. and Penske Logistics LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv61286
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 Initial Disclosure(s) by Penske Logistics LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P. (Gomes, Matthew)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Scott Silverman Mediation Deadline 9/3/2019. Mediation Hearing set for 8/28/2019 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Christopher Todman, Scott J. Silverman. Mediation Hearing set for 8/28/2019 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saavedra, Nathaly)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2019., Discovery due by 3/10/2020., Expert Discovery due by 3/10/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 8/12/2019., Mediation Deadline 3/24/2020., In Limine Motions due by 4/1/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2020., Motions due by 4/1/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/22/2020., Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 6/30/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Christopher Todman (Saavedra, Nathaly)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Penske Logistics LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P. (Gomes, Matthew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Penske Logistics LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Mitsui & Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Penske Automotive Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Penske Truck Leasing Corporation for Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P.; Corporate Parent Penske Truck Leasing Corporation for Penske Logistics LLC (Gomes, Matthew)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Penske Logistics LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P.. (Gomes, Matthew)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Penske Logistics LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P. of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Case Detail from Broward County Clerk of Courts) (Gomes, Matthew)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/12/2019, Answer due 5/29/2019) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Penske Logistics LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Penske Truck Leasing Corporation for Penske Logistics LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P. (Gomes, Matthew)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11665491, filed by Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P., Penske Logistics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Penske Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B- PTL Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit C- Notice of Removal to Clerk, #5 Exhibit D- Notice of Removal to Counsel)(Gomes, Matthew) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Text Modified on 5/22/2019 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todman v. Penske Logistics LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Todman
Represented By: Nathaly Saavedra
Represented By: Peter Michael Hoogerwoerd
Represented By: Carlos D. Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P.
Represented By: Kyle Ryan Jackson, Sr.
Represented By: Matthew Trainor Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Logistics LLC
Represented By: Kyle Ryan Jackson, Sr.
Represented By: Matthew Trainor Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?