Pierre-Louis et al v. SP Plus Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Evens Hilaire, Jean Emmanuel Pierre-Louis, Seneque Lubin, Eriles Maxean, Assade Vedrine, Jean Claude Dorelus and Renald Seraphin
Defendant: SP Plus Corporation and Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv61306
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0002
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Reset Answer Due Deadline: Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc. response due 7/26/2019; SP Plus Corporation response due 7/26/2019. (ls)(per DE #18)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING IN PART #17 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint and a response to Plaintiff's Statement of Claims by no later than July 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/12/2019. (fc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc., SP Plus Corporation. Attorney Jennifer Monrose Moore added to party Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Monrose Moore added to party SP Plus Corporation(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Jennifer)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jean Emmanuel Pierre-Louis. SP Plus Corporation served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Johnson, Kristy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jean Emmanuel Pierre-Louis. Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc. served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Johnson, Kristy)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Statement of Claims. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/25/2019. (fc)
June 23, 2019 Filing 13 Statement of: of Claim by Jean Emmanuel Pierre-Louis (Johnson, Kristy)
June 23, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff's MOTION for Limited Relief from Orders, or Alternatively, Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Statement of Claim ( Responses due by 7/8/2019) by Jean Emmanuel Pierre-Louis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Kristy) Modified Text on 6/24/2019 (ls).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Requiring Compliance. On or before June 21, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a Statement of Claim in compliance with this Court's May 29th Order ECF No. #6 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #9 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Seneque Lubin and Renald Seraphin. (Johnson, Kristy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Kristy Marie Johnson on behalf of Evens Hilaire, Jean Emmanuel Pierre-Louis (Attachments: #1 Consents to Become Party Plaintiff) (Johnson, Kristy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #2 Notice (Other) into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jean Claude Dorelus, Eriles Maxean and Assade Vedrine. (Johnson, Kristy)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER of Instructions for Setting a Settlement Conference. The District Court has entered an Order [DE 6] referring the case to the undersigned for a settlement conference to be conducted within 14 days of Defendants filing their response to Plaintiff's Notice of Claim. Accordingly, within ten (10) days of appearance by defense counsel, counsel for the parties are ORDERED to meet and confer, either telephonically or in person, for the purpose of determining a date on which to conduct the settlement conference. Within three days of that conference, Plaintiffs counsel shall telephone Chambers with no fewer than three dates (for the full business day) on which the parties and their counsel will be available for the settlement conference, within the time period allotted by the District Court's Order. Following the submission of proposed dates, the undersigned will enter an order setting the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/30/2019. (pb00)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER IN ACTIONS BROUGHT UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT, referring case to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for Settlement. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re #2 Notice (Other). Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties/Mediator and add the additional parties. AND Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The correct event is Notice of Consent to Join. (ls)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Evens Hilaire, Jean Emmanuel Pierre-Louis of Filing Consents to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Consents to Become Party Plaintiffs) (Johnson, Kristy)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc., SP Plus Corporation. (mee)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc., SP Plus Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11672440, payment transferred from : 19cv22107 Pierre-Louis et al v. SP Plus Corporation et al, filed by Jean Emmanuel Pierre-Louis, Evens Hilaire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Johnson, Kristy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierre-Louis et al v. SP Plus Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SP Plus Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Monrose Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baggage Airline Guest Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Monrose Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evens Hilaire
Represented By: Kristy Marie Johnson
Represented By: Jason R. Alderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Emmanuel Pierre-Louis
Represented By: Kristy Marie Johnson
Represented By: Jason R. Alderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seneque Lubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eriles Maxean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assade Vedrine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Claude Dorelus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renald Seraphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?