Perlman v. American Express Centurion Bank et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan E. Perlman, Esq. and Jonathan E. Perlman
Defendant: American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., American Express Company, American Express Bank, FSB and American Express Centurion Bank
Case Number: 0:2019cv61386
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:0754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, Incorporated Memorandum of Law by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc.. Attorney Jeffrey Clark Schneider added to party American Express Bank, FSB(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Clark Schneider added to party American Express Centurion Bank(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Clark Schneider added to party American Express Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Clark Schneider added to party American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/15/2019 (Schneider, Jeffrey)
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Grace McIntosh on behalf of Jonathan E. Perlman. Attorney Elizabeth Grace McIntosh added to party Jonathan E. Perlman(pty:pla). (McIntosh, Elizabeth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Jonathan E. Perlman (Garno, Gregory)
June 26, 2019 Reset Answer Due Deadline: American Express Bank, FSB response due 8/1/2019; American Express Centurion Bank response due 8/1/2019; American Express Company response due 8/1/2019; American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc. response due 8/1/2019. (ls)(per DE #17)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before August 1, 2019. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/26/2019. (mkz)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc.. Attorney Victoria Jean Wilson added to party American Express Bank, FSB(pty:dft), Attorney Victoria Jean Wilson added to party American Express Centurion Bank(pty:dft), Attorney Victoria Jean Wilson added to party American Express Company(pty:dft), Attorney Victoria Jean Wilson added to party American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Victoria)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Summons Returned Executed, #10 Summons Returned Executed,. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see [de#12, 13]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jonathan E. Perlman. American Express Company served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (ls)(See Image at DE #11)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jonathan E. Perlman. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (ls)(See Image at DE #10)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jonathan E. Perlman. American Express Company served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Garno, Gregory)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jonathan E. Perlman. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc. served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Garno, Gregory)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jonathan E. Perlman. American Express Centurion Bank served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Garno, Gregory)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jonathan E. Perlman. American Express Bank, FSB served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Garno, Gregory)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc.. (jas)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance of Filing Fees $400.00, receipt number 113C-11698199 re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Garno, Gregory)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The filing fee has not been paid (pcs)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $400.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (pcs)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Jonathan E. Perlman, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Garno, Gregory)Not Paid/No IFP. Modified on 6/4/2019 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perlman v. American Express Centurion Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc.
Represented By: Victoria Jean Wilson
Represented By: Jeffrey Clark Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Represented By: Victoria Jean Wilson
Represented By: Jeffrey Clark Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Bank, FSB
Represented By: Victoria Jean Wilson
Represented By: Jeffrey Clark Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Centurion Bank
Represented By: Victoria Jean Wilson
Represented By: Jeffrey Clark Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan E. Perlman, Esq.
Represented By: Gregory Matthew Garno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan E. Perlman
Represented By: Gregory Matthew Garno
Represented By: Elizabeth Grace McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?