Vermont Mutual Insurance Company v. Wheaton Van Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vermont Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Olympia Moving & Storage and Wheaton Van Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv61388
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Approving Stipulation Of Dismissal. Closing Case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Vermont Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Order on Joint Stipulation for Dismissal)(Stevens, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, denying as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (lh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Vermont Mutual Insurance Company (Stevens, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Requiring Counsel To Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report, And Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wheaton Van Lines and by Olympia Moving & Storage. Responses due by 6/19/2019 (Roth, Heidi)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Filing Civil Cover Sheet re 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case into CM/ECF. (Roth, Heidi) Modified text on 6/5/2019 (vmz).
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Theodore A. Stevens, mailing date June 4, 2019, (pt)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 3 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 CORRECTED Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Plaintiff Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. The Clerk added the Plaintiff. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz) Modified on 6/4/2019 (vmz).
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. v Olympia Moving & Storage and Wheaton Van Lines) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11697699, filed by Wheaton Van Lines, Inc., Olympia Moving & Storage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Service Docs, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing NOR, #4 Exhibit Civil Cover Shee (p.1))(Roth, Heidi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vermont Mutual Insurance Company v. Wheaton Van Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympia Moving & Storage
Represented By: Heidi M. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheaton Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi M. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermont Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore A. Stevens
Represented By: Michael Bernard Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?