Marteen v. Rutti Auto Broker, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Helen Marteen
Defendant: Rutti Auto Broker, LLC and Diego L. Rutti
Case Number: 0:2019cv61398
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Party Defendant, Diego L. Rutti, and Memorandum of Law by Helen Marteen. Responses due by 8/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #9 Diego L. Rutti's Motion to Dismiss Party Defendant. This Motion #9 appears to have been refiled as #10 , rendering #9 moot. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/19/2019. (mkz)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Diego L. Rutti. Attorney Carlos Santisteban, Jr added to party Diego L. Rutti(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/1/2019 (Santisteban, Carlos)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Rutti Auto Broker, LLC. Responses due by 8/1/2019 (Santisteban, Carlos)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Rutti Auto Broker, LLC. (Santisteban, Carlos)
July 9, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline per Order DE# 7 : Diego L. Rutti response due 7/18/2019; Rutti Auto Broker, LLC response due 7/18/2019. (lh)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants RUTTI AUTO BROKER, LLC. and DIEGO L. RUTTI shall respond to the Complaint on or before July 18, 2019. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/8/2019. (mkz)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Rutti Auto Broker, LLC. Responses due by 7/22/2019 (Santisteban, Carlos)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carlos Santisteban, Jr on behalf of Rutti Auto Broker, LLC. Attorney Carlos Santisteban, Jr added to party Rutti Auto Broker, LLC(pty:dft). (Santisteban, Carlos)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Counsel To Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report, And Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Diego L. Rutti, Rutti Auto Broker, LLC. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INCIDENTAL RELIEF against Rutti Auto Broker, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11699960, filed by Helen Marteen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Buyer's Order, #3 Exhibit B - Buy-Back Buyers Order, #4 Exhibit C - Buy-Back RISC, #5 Exhibit D - Actual Cost of Credit Calculation (APR Disclosure Documentation), #6 Summon(s) Rutti Auto Broker, LLC, #7 Summon(s) Diego L. Rutti)(Murphy, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marteen v. Rutti Auto Broker, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Marteen
Represented By: Robert William Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rutti Auto Broker, LLC
Represented By: Carlos Santisteban, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diego L. Rutti
Represented By: Carlos Santisteban, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?