Chanel, Inc. v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Defendant: The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", bagsjewelry.site, ky9968, store-cn.com, brownnrio, 1209lyxzdy, CurielArt, Dotara, Stephen Saia LA, Shop4478094 Store, rahmandoli_0, kementotena0, nvjgnbfby-6, Customization Expert, 4-sktuf, BibyStyle Official Store, harsandreant0, xujian, ThaiFabricStore, roseleatherhandmadestudio, Demeterclub, Kingdom good, lethan-12, wenmyteam, oppomb, joycuffe, Oorbellen Factory Store, Michelle Crosso, shiguoyun, chinatradeweb, WenYe Appliances Trading Company, Shop4415123 Store, Tsdlrh Store, Raizen, Shmik Store, sumiarsho0, new7711, Msaimee Store, LsByElsa, Enjoy Exlifshop, chilipeppervintage, HongjunBrooch, poudbdh, Lidavi Store, mvpplu, supursev.site, Braceletas, PopularBeautyCN, hpass, cofaj0 and RachelByEarthaec
Case Number: 0:2019cv61416
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 32 Clerks Entry of Default as to See attached Schedule A - Motions Terminated: #31 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,,,, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A) (dj)
August 1, 2019 Filing 31 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to 1209lyxzdy, 4-sktuf, BibyStyle Official Store, Braceletas, CurielArt, Customization Expert, Demeterclub, Dotara, Enjoy Exlifshop, HongjunBrooch, Lidavi Store, LsByElsa, Michelle Crosso, Msaimee Store, Oorbellen Factory Store, PopularBeautyCN, RachelByEarthaec, Raizen, Shmik Store, Shop4415123 Store, Shop4478094 Store, Stephen Saia LA, ThaiFabricStore, The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", Tsdlrh Store, WenYe Appliances Trading Company, bagsjewelry.site, brownnrio, chilipeppervintage, cofaj0, harsandreant0, hpass, joycuffe, kementotena0, ky9968, lethan-12, mvpplu, new7711, nvjgnbfby-6, oppomb, poudbdh, rahmandoli_0, roseleatherhandmadestudio, shiguoyun, store-cn.com, sumiarsho0, wenmyteam, xujian by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support of Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 18, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #26 Preliminary Injunction,, Order, via Publication (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 18, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #26 Preliminary Injunction,, Order, upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 18, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Chanel, Inc.. 1209lyxzdy served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; 4-sktuf served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; BibyStyle Official Store served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Braceletas served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; CurielArt served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Customization Expert served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Demeterclub served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Dotara served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Enjoy Exlifshop served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; HongjunBrooch served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Lidavi Store served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; LsByElsa served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Michelle Crosso served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Msaimee Store served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Oorbellen Factory Store served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; PopularBeautyCN served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; RachelByEarthaec served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Raizen served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Shmik Store served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Shop4415123 Store served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Shop4478094 Store served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Stephen Saia LA served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; ThaiFabricStore served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; Tsdlrh Store served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; WenYe Appliances Trading Company served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; bagsjewelry.site served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; brownnrio served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; chilipeppervintage served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; cofaj0 served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; harsandreant0 served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; hpass served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; joycuffe served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; kementotena0 served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; ky9968 served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; lethan-12 served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; mvpplu served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; new7711 served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; nvjgnbfby-6 served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; oppomb served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; poudbdh served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; rahmandoli_0 served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; roseleatherhandmadestudio served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; shiguoyun served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; store-cn.com served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; sumiarsho0 served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; wenmyteam served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019; xujian served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, granting #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Chanel, Inc. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
July 10, 2019 Filing 27 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roy K. Altman: Motion Hearing held on 7/10/2019 re #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Chanel, Inc. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5686 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. (tas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Unsealing All Sealed Documents pursuant to 21 Paperless Order (nc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #11 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #16 Plaintiff's Motion to Unseal Documents , 7 Order on Motion to Seal, #3 Form AO 120/121, #13 Notice (Other), #18 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es), #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4, #17 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF,,, via Publication (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #16 Plaintiff's Motion to Unseal Documents , 7 Order on Motion to Seal, #17 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF,,, upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Chanel, Inc. of E-Mail Inquiries Received by certain Defendants in connection with Asset Restraint and Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Notice of Email Inquiries) (Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified Text on 7/10/2019 (ls).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Unseal. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal all documents in this case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/8/2019. (vve)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to 1209lyxzdy, 4-sktuf, BibyStyle Official Store, Braceletas, CurielArt, Customization Expert, Demeterclub, Dotara, Enjoy Exlifshop, HongjunBrooch, Lidavi Store, LsByElsa, Michelle Crosso, Msaimee Store, Oorbellen Factory Store, PopularBeautyCN, RachelByEarthaec, Raizen, Shmik Store, Shop4415123 Store, Shop4478094 Store, Stephen Saia LA, ThaiFabricStore, Tsdlrh Store, WenYe Appliances Trading Company, bagsjewelry.site, brownnrio, chilipeppervintage, cofaj0, harsandreant0, hpass, joycuffe, kementotena0, ky9968, lethan-12, mvpplu, new7711, nvjgnbfby-6, oppomb, poudbdh, rahmandoli_0, roseleatherhandmadestudio, shiguoyun, store-cn.com, sumiarsho0, wenmyteam, xujian. (ls)
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 Clerks Notice to Filer re #16 Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Chanel, Inc. re #11 Order on Ex Parte Motion (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) combined) (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Braceletas, Customization Expert, Enjoy Exlifshop, hpass, Michelle Crosso, oppomb, Raizen, Stephen Saia LA, WenYe Appliances Trading Company, xujian, brownnrio, Dotara, joycuffe, poudbdh, shiguoyun, BibyStyle Official Store, Lidavi Store, Msaimee Store, Oorbellen Factory Store, Shmik Store, Shop4415123 Store, Shop4478094 Store, Tsdlrh Store, 1209lyxzdy, chilipeppervintage, cofaj0, lethan-12, new7711, wenmyteam, 4-sktuf, harsandreant0, kementotena0, ky9968, mvpplu, nvjgnbfby-6, rahmandoli_0, roseleatherhandmadestudio, sumiarsho0, CurielArt, Demeterclub, HongjunBrooch, LsByElsa, PopularBeautyCN, RachelByEarthaec, ThaiFabricStore, bagsjewelry.site and store-cn.com. (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal Documents by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified Relief on 7/8/2019 (ls).
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order; granting #14 Ex Parte Motion for Continuance Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/21/2019. (cbr) Modified by Unsealing Document per 21 Paperless Order on 7/10/2019 (nc).
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION To Extend Temporary Restraining Order and To Continue Hearing Scheduled for June 24, 2019 In Connection with Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan In Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion To Extend Temporary Restraining Order and to Continue Hearing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified by Unsealing Document per 21 Paperless Order on 7/10/2019 (nc).
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Bond by Chanel, Inc. (ls)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order; granting #6 Ex Parte Application For Entry of Temporary Restraining Order Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/14/2019. (cbr) Modified by Unsealing Document per 21 Paperless Order on 7/10/2019 (nc).
June 14, 2019 Set/Reset Sealed Deadlines/Hearings : Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/24/2019 03:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. per DE #12 (cbr) Modified by Unsealing pursuant to 21 Paperless Order on 7/10/2019 (nc).
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (dj)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Amended Complaint) (Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified by Unsealing Document per 21 Paperless Order on 7/10/2019 (nc).
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Sealed Filing by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule "A" to the Complaint) (Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified by Unsealing Document per 21 Paperless Order on 7/10/2019 (nc).
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Gaffigan Decl., #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified by Unsealing Document per 21 Paperless Order on 7/10/2019 (nc).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal. The Plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint and Schedule "A" to its Amended Complaint under seal. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/10/2019. (vve)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Bleys in Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support Thereof, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Gaffigan Decl., #4 Declaration of Eric Rosaler in Support Thereof, #5 Exhibit 1 to the Rosaler Decl. - part 1, #6 Exhibit 1 to the Rosaler Decl. - part 2, #7 Exhibit 1 to the Rosaler Decl. - part 3, #8 Exhibit 1 to the Rosaler Decl. - part 4, #9 Exhibit 1 to the Rosaler Decl. - part 5, #10 Declaration of Kathleen Burns in Support Thereof, #11 Exhibit 1 to the Burns Decl. - part 1, #12 Exhibit 1 to the Burns Decl. - part 2, #13 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified by Unsealing Document per 21 Paperless Order on 7/10/2019 (nc).
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaffigan, Stephen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chanel, Inc. (Gaffigan, Stephen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11709456, filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Chanel Trademarks)(Gaffigan, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chanel, Inc. v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bagsjewelry.site
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ky9968
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: store-cn.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: brownnrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1209lyxzdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CurielArt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dotara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Saia LA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop4478094 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rahmandoli_0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kementotena0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nvjgnbfby-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Customization Expert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4-sktuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BibyStyle Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: harsandreant0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xujian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ThaiFabricStore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: roseleatherhandmadestudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demeterclub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lethan-12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wenmyteam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: oppomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: joycuffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oorbellen Factory Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Crosso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shiguoyun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chinatradeweb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WenYe Appliances Trading Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop4415123 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tsdlrh Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raizen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shmik Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sumiarsho0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: new7711
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Msaimee Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LsByElsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enjoy Exlifshop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chilipeppervintage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HongjunBrooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: poudbdh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lidavi Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mvpplu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: supursev.site
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Braceletas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PopularBeautyCN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hpass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cofaj0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RachelByEarthaec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?