MOSS v. Town Of Davie et al
Plaintiff: GIOVANNI MOSS
Defendant: Town Of Davie and RICHARD LEMACK
Case Number: 0:2019cv61417
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Margaret Hood Mevers on behalf of RICHARD LEMACK, Town Of Davie. Attorney Margaret Hood Mevers added to party RICHARD LEMACK(pty:dft), Attorney Margaret Hood Mevers added to party Town Of Davie(pty:dft). (Mevers, Margaret)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties (as to Discovery issues ONLY). Filed by GIOVANNI MOSS (Cadogan, Gina)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by GIOVANNI MOSS (Cadogan, Gina)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by GIOVANNI MOSS. Town Of Davie served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (Cadogan, Gina)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by GIOVANNI MOSS. GIOVANNI MOSS served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Cadogan, Gina)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/22/2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to RICHARD LEMACK, Town Of Davie. (mc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by GIOVANNI MOSS re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) Summons for Lemack for issuance by Clerk (Cadogan, Gina)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by GIOVANNI MOSS re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) Summons for Town of Davie for issuance by Clerk (Cadogan, Gina)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, Judge Kathleen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (jao)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11709644, filed by GIOVANNI MOSS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Cadogan, Gina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOSS v. Town Of Davie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIOVANNI MOSS
Represented By: Gina Marie Cadogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town Of Davie
Represented By: Margaret Hood Mevers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD LEMACK
Represented By: Margaret Hood Mevers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?