Gucci America, Inc. v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Gucci America, Inc.
Defendant: The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", neddy.99, anxunss, yishengpingan226, KuninganLoverz, yongkwijanark-0, JiuTOPAA, arz058, Canlans, Balgey, Chibi Store, Marco K Mullins, BBNO1, gundopaco-0, yunguantui7fr, puxingjing85644, blueblood., Huut, minkki, high-quality-market, He Aihua, Coubin, jerryshoppe, glenda86, shijiat, qunla-84, edsofart, lianxinnuo40448, flnasr_0, mysnai_0, custom-tees, FushionShop, QEWY, 45mkj8nb20, tanitanjan_0, shizongmaoyi, apilooking, HUACHENG GONGMAO CO.LTD., mbxstore, memery-31, ZXNQIQI, diakartin_4, Mingyuming, amyma123a, MAVON, NUTLCE, moarn-28, alaiyacase, Flowerorld, jiehaoyuntong, arktic1955, lanliangdao519153, tiffylove, Bozhou City Noxin Trading Co., Ltd, wpeeq, discountfitness777, nur_97, jiangailv, siskdarwant-0, petitemother45, jackhandsmooth, alfatku_0, Sun Hui Bo, tesarindu_biz, shagor, flad_5, liuiueyy, whitemagicart, happydogdogstore, store1081, rubida*, sampoerna199, lzteam, Goes Boys&Girls and Dorapocket
Case Number: 0:2019cv61447
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Gucci America, Inc.. 45mkj8nb20 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; BBNO1 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; Balgey served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; Bozhou City Noxin Trading Co., Ltd served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; Canlans served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; Chibi Store served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; Coubin served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; Dorapocket served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; Flowerorld served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; FushionShop served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; Goes Boys&Girls served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; HUACHENG GONGMAO CO.LTD. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; He Aihua served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; Huut served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; JiuTOPAA served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; KuninganLoverz served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; MAVON served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; Marco K Mullins served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; Mingyuming served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; NUTLCE served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; QEWY served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; Sun Hui Bo served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; alaiyacase served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; alfatku_0 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; amyma123a served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; anxunss served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; apilooking served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; arktic1955 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; arz058 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; custom-tees served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; diakartin_4 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; discountfitness777 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; edsofart served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; flad_5 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; flnasr_0 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; glenda86 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; gundopaco-0 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; happydogdogstore served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; high-quality-market served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; jackhandsmooth served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; jerryshoppe served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; jiangailv served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; jiehaoyuntong served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; lanliangdao519153 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; lianxinnuo40448 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; liuiueyy served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; lzteam served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; mbxstore served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; minkki served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; moarn-28 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; mysnai_0 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; neddy.99 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; nur_97 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; petitemother45 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; puxingjing85644 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; qunla-84 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; rubida served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; sampoerna199 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; shagor served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; shijiat served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; shizongmaoyi served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; siskdarwant-0 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; store1081 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; tanitanjan_0 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; tesarindu_biz served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; tiffylove served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; whitemagicart served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; yishengpingan226 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; yongkwijanark-0 served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019; yunguantui7fr served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order re #6 Application for Entry of Preliminary Injunction Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
July 30, 2019 Filing 26 Clerk's Notice of Compliance re #25 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (cbr)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Unseal. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 24 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roy K. Altman: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 7/29/2019. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 10 minutes. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5686 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jrf)
July 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Gucci America, Inc. Of E-Mail Inquiries Received From Certain Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Notice of Email Inquiries) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gucci America, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4, #12 Bond, #17 Amended Complaint, #3 Form AO 120/121, #16 Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Unseal , #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, via Publication (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 25, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gucci America, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4, #17 Amended Complaint, #16 Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Unseal upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 25, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to 45mkj8nb20, BBNO1, Balgey, Bozhou City Noxin Trading Co., Ltd, Canlans, Chibi Store, Coubin, Dorapocket, Flowerorld, FushionShop, Goes Boys&Girls, HUACHENG GONGMAO CO.LTD., He Aihua, Huut, JiuTOPAA, KuninganLoverz, MAVON, Marco K Mullins, Mingyuming, NUTLCE, QEWY, Sun Hui Bo, The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", alaiyacase, alfatku_0, amyma123a, anxunss, apilooking, arktic1955, arz058, custom-tees, diakartin_4, discountfitness777, edsofart, flad_5, flnasr_0, glenda86, gundopaco-0, happydogdogstore, high-quality-market, jackhandsmooth, jerryshoppe, jiangailv, jiehaoyuntong, lanliangdao519153, lianxinnuo40448, liuiueyy, lzteam, mbxstore, minkki, moarn-28, mysnai_0, neddy.99, nur_97, petitemother45, puxingjing85644, qunla-84, rubida, sampoerna199, shagor, shijiat, shizongmaoyi, siskdarwant-0, store1081, tanitanjan_0, tesarindu_biz, tiffylove, whitemagicart, yishengpingan226, yongkwijanark-0, yunguantui7fr. (cbr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Gucci America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, of Defendant Number 47 by Gucci America, Inc. (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Amended Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Gucci Trademarks)(Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff's MOTION Motion to Unseal by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
July 16, 2019 Set/Reset Sealed Deadlines/Hearings : Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/29/2019 03:30 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. per DE #15 (cbr) Modified to unseal per DE #25 on 7/30/2019 (cbr).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Sealed Order; granting #13 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Continue Hearing Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/15/2019. (cbr) Modified to unseal per DE #25 on 7/30/2019 (cbr).
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 Sealed Document by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule "A" to Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) Modified to unseal per DE #25 on 7/30/2019 (cbr).
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Dated July 2, 2019 and to Continue Hearing Scheduled for July 16, 2019 by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez in Support Thereof, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) Modified to unseal per DE #25 on 7/30/2019 (cbr).
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Bond. Seizure Bond in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by Gucci America, Inc. Approved by Judge Roy K. Altman (mee)Text Modified on 7/10/2019 (mee).
July 9, 2019 Set/Reset Sealed Deadlines/Hearings : Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/16/2019 01:45 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. per DE #11 (cbr) Modified to unseal per DE #25 on 7/30/2019 (cbr).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Sealed Order re #8 Sealed Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/9/2019. (cbr) Modified to unseal per DE #25 on 7/30/2019 (cbr).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Sealed Order; granting #7 Ex Parte Motion for Alternate Service Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/2/2019. (cbr) Modified to unseal per DE #25 on 7/30/2019 (cbr).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Sealed Order; granting #5 Motion to Seal Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/2/2019. (cbr) Modified to unseal per DE #25 on 7/30/2019 (cbr).
July 3, 2019 Set/Reset Sealed Deadlines/Hearings : Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/9/2019 01:30 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. per DE #8 (cbr) Modified to unseal per DE #25 on 7/30/2019 (cbr).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Sealed Order; granting #6 Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/2/2019. (cbr) Modified to unseal per DE #25 on 7/30/2019 (cbr).
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) Modified to unseal per DE #25 on 7/30/2019 (cbr).
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica Haugen in Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez in Support Thereof, #3 Declaration of Eric Rosaler in Support Thereof, #4 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Eric Rosaler, #5 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Eric Rosaler, #6 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Eric Rosaler, #7 Text of Proposed Order) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) Modified to unseal per DE #25 on 7/30/2019 (cbr).
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gucci America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kering Americas, Inc., Corporate Parent Kering Holland NV, Corporate Parent Kering SA for Gucci America, Inc. (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11719311, filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Gucci Trademarks)(Gaffigan, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gucci America, Inc. v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gucci America, Inc.
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: neddy.99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: anxunss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yishengpingan226
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KuninganLoverz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yongkwijanark-0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JiuTOPAA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: arz058
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canlans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balgey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chibi Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco K Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBNO1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gundopaco-0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yunguantui7fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: puxingjing85644
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: blueblood.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: minkki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: high-quality-market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: He Aihua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jerryshoppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: glenda86
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shijiat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: qunla-84
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: edsofart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lianxinnuo40448
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: flnasr_0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mysnai_0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: custom-tees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FushionShop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QEWY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 45mkj8nb20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tanitanjan_0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shizongmaoyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: apilooking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUACHENG GONGMAO CO.LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mbxstore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: memery-31
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZXNQIQI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: diakartin_4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mingyuming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: amyma123a
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAVON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUTLCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: moarn-28
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: alaiyacase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowerorld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jiehaoyuntong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: arktic1955
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lanliangdao519153
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tiffylove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bozhou City Noxin Trading Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wpeeq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: discountfitness777
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nur_97
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jiangailv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: siskdarwant-0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: petitemother45
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jackhandsmooth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: alfatku_0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Hui Bo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tesarindu_biz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shagor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: flad_5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: liuiueyy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: whitemagicart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: happydogdogstore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: store1081
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rubida*
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sampoerna199
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lzteam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goes Boys&Girls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorapocket
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?