SFR SERVICES LLC v. AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Plaintiff: SFR SERVICES LLC (A/A/O GERALD GOLDFARB) and SFR SERVICES LLC
Defendant: AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 0:2019cv61474
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of Dismissal. Closing Case. Motions terminated: #11 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SFR SERVICES LLC (Webb, Paris)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #14 the Plaintiff's unopposed motion for an enlargement of time to file its response to the Defendant's motion to dismiss. The Plaintiff's response is due on or before August 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 7/24/2019. (jaa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by SFR SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Webb, Paris)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 6/30/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 3/10/2020.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Medeiros, Crystalin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY. Responses due by 7/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Medeiros, Crystalin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by SFR SERVICES LLC (Webb, Paris)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by SFR SERVICES LLC (Webb, Paris)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY (Medeiros, Crystalin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY (Medeiros, Crystalin)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #4 the Defendant's motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. The Defendant must file its response to the complaint on or before July 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 6/20/2019. (kbe)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Medeiros, Crystalin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11729276, filed by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Medeiros, Crystalin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SFR SERVICES LLC v. AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SFR SERVICES LLC (A/A/O GERALD GOLDFARB)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SFR SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Paris Richard Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Crystalin C Medeiros
Represented By: Steven Charles Teebagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?