Cartier International A.G. et al v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Cartier International A.G., Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA and Montblanc-Simplo GMBH
Defendant: The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", luxe_labels, Ulian, HouLily, frcise03-2, du mei, mojojewelry_yw, rkingsales, wangwangh, KLGhskjfkd806, blues51, bangkun822_9, kaimap, mocc20, XUELE, myaccessoriess, Biliatea, beautyeshop, amir2010190_1, thomapeas26, TQ-ip3w, ZOSHOP, Fashionable boutique, hotjewelrysaler, rbeagvwesdbresd, Lolliper147, limingai, shizongmaoyi, xhgroup85-shop, nguye-4335, shop_pens, Youth Tree, LOPONS, myplum, lubinhanMMG, GETUPBA, Tandider Supply, choi_diamondandgoldph, keguoli_20, lixiaoxia8888, Yetss478, kirshe-18, shopmoom, Pyzer, Excow Jewelry, NUTLCE, Sland jewelry, shenzen_china, HuoHim, LonelyOceann, danostore, Hugbo, Byqone, z_li7851, Fineog668, YJIAN, th-161105, suningyigounvzhang, sonyst16, Only Store24, KingFast SSD, fashionintrand, zfyyouth0104, jim-fashion.store, ZLL-OTO, BRINGU, luxelabels, Charles WesT, vadov-94, miloais.my, likesu_34, huanying6, Correst, hamab74, woopishmonk, YANGANG, sunhuiisDADY, carryleen, artistic_glass, D.B.MOOD Jewelry's Store, cullture, littlefaerie, DUOPIAN, whillows, suntree*store, YINGZHOULIN, coolmart00, DENNES, Hairbeauty LLC, Tooffee, chengdushijingxingkangbaozhuangzhipinyouxiangongsi, linh_store, hy168, Golden Shopping, s9-pen.store, quietwell, DDeper, soso1993, globalm-37, shenjinqi, majestic.brands and BlackkkkkkkHack
Case Number: 0:2019cv61497
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re #32 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to BRINGU, Biliatea, BlackkkkkkkHack, Byqone, Charles WesT, Correst, D.B.MOOD Jewelry's Store, DDeper, DENNES, DUOPIAN, Excow Jewelry, Fashionable boutique, Fineog668, GETUPBA, Golden Shopping, Hairbeauty LLC, HouLily, Hugbo, HuoHim, KLGhskjfkd806, KingFast SSD, LOPONS, Lolliper147, LonelyOceann, NUTLCE, Only Store24, Pyzer, Sland jewelry, TQ-ip3w, Tandider Supply, Tooffee, Ulian, XUELE, YANGANG, YINGZHOULIN, YJIAN, Yetss478, Youth Tree, ZLL-OTO, ZOSHOP, amir2010190_1, artistic_glass, bangkun822_9, beautyeshop, blues51, carryleen, chengdushijingxingkangbaozhuangzhipinyouxiangongsi, choi_diamondandgoldph, coolmart00, cullture, danostore, du mei, fashionintrand, frcise03-2, globalm-37, hamab74, hotjewelrysaler, huanying6, hy168, jim-fashion.store, kaimap, keguoli_20, kirshe-18, likesu_34, limingai, linh_store, littlefaerie, lixiaoxia8888, lubinhanMMG, luxe_labels, majestic.brands, miloais.my, mocc20, mojojewelry_yw, myaccessoriess, myplum, nguye-4335, quietwell, rbeagvwesdbresd, rkingsales, s9-pen.store, shenjinqi, shenzen_china, shizongmaoyi, shop_pens, shopmoom, sonyst16, soso1993, sunhuiisDADY, suningyigounvzhang, suntreestore, th-161105, thomapeas26, vadov-94, wangwangh, whillows, woopishmonk, xhgroup85-shop, z_li7851, zfyyouth0104. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 7/23/2019. (cbr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 32 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to BRINGU, Biliatea, BlackkkkkkkHack, Byqone, Charles WesT, Correst, D.B.MOOD Jewelry's Store, DDeper, DENNES, DUOPIAN, Excow Jewelry, Fashionable boutique, Fineog668, GETUPBA, Golden Shopping, Hairbeauty LLC, HouLily, Hugbo, HuoHim, KLGhskjfkd806, KingFast SSD, LOPONS, Lolliper147, LonelyOceann, NUTLCE, Only Store24, Pyzer, Sland jewelry, TQ-ip3w, Tandider Supply, The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", Tooffee, Ulian, XUELE, YANGANG, YINGZHOULIN, YJIAN, Yetss478, Youth Tree, ZLL-OTO, ZOSHOP, amir2010190_1, artistic_glass, bangkun822_9, beautyeshop, blues51, carryleen, chengdushijingxingkangbaozhuangzhipinyouxiangongsi, choi_diamondandgoldph, coolmart00, cullture, danostore, du mei, fashionintrand, frcise03-2, globalm-37, hamab74, hotjewelrysaler, huanying6, hy168, jim-fashion.store, kaimap, keguoli_20, kirshe-18, likesu_34, limingai, linh_store, littlefaerie, lixiaoxia8888, lubinhanMMG, luxe_labels, majestic.brands, miloais.my, mocc20, myaccessoriess, myplum, nguye-4335, quietwell, rbeagvwesdbresd, rkingsales, s9-pen.store, shenjinqi, shenzen_china, shizongmaoyi, shop_pens, shopmoom, sonyst16, soso1993, sunhuiisDADY, suningyigounvzhang, suntreestore, th-161105, thomapeas26, vadov-94, wangwangh, whillows, woopishmonk, xhgroup85-shop, z_li7851, zfyyouth0104 by Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Cartier International A.G., Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support Thereof, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: re #8 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION For Entry Of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, And Order Restraining Transfer Of Assets filed by Cartier International A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA, Officine Panerai A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
July 11, 2019 Filing 30 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 7/11/2019. No one present on behalf of defendants. Injunction is granted. Written Order to enter. Total time in court: 05 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Virgilio Gigante, Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. (kc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA Of E-Mail Inquiry Received By Defendant Number 60 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Notice of Email Inquiry) (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 10, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA Of E-Mail Inquiries Received From Certain Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Notice of Email Inquiries) (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 8, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Cartier International A.G., Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA. BRINGU served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Biliatea served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; BlackkkkkkkHack served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Byqone served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Charles WesT served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Correst served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; D.B.MOOD Jewelry's Store served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; DDeper served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; DENNES served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; DUOPIAN served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Excow Jewelry served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Fashionable boutique served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Fineog668 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; GETUPBA served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Golden Shopping served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Hairbeauty LLC served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; HouLily served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Hugbo served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; HuoHim served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; KLGhskjfkd806 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; KingFast SSD served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; LOPONS served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Lolliper147 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; LonelyOceann served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; NUTLCE served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Only Store24 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Pyzer served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Sland jewelry served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; TQ-ip3w served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Tandider Supply served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Tooffee served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Ulian served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; XUELE served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; YANGANG served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; YINGZHOULIN served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; YJIAN served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Yetss478 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Youth Tree served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; ZLL-OTO served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; ZOSHOP served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; amir2010190_1 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; artistic_glass served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; bangkun822_9 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; beautyeshop served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; blues51 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; carryleen served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; chengdushijingxingkangbaozhuangzhipinyouxiangongsi served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; choi_diamondandgoldph served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; coolmart00 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; cullture served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; danostore served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; du mei served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; fashionintrand served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; frcise03-2 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; globalm-37 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; hamab74 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; hotjewelrysaler served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; huanying6 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; hy168 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; jim-fashion.store served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; kaimap served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; keguoli_20 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; kirshe-18 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; likesu_34 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; limingai served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; linh_store served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; littlefaerie served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; lixiaoxia8888 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; lubinhanMMG served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; luxe_labels served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; majestic.brands served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; miloais.my served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; mocc20 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; myaccessoriess served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; myplum served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; nguye-4335 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; quietwell served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; rbeagvwesdbresd served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; rkingsales served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; s9-pen.store served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; shenjinqi served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; shenzen_china served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; shizongmaoyi served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; shop_pens served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; shopmoom served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; sonyst16 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; soso1993 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; sunhuiisDADY served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; suningyigounvzhang served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; suntreestore served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; th-161105 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; thomapeas26 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; vadov-94 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; wangwangh served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; whillows served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; woopishmonk served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; xhgroup85-shop served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; z_li7851 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; zfyyouth0104 served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 8, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA re #13 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, #8 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION For Entry Of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, And Order Restraining Transfer Of Assets , #11 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #10 Order on Motion to Seal, #16 Bond, #18 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF,,,,, #4 Form AO 120/121, #17 Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal , #1 Complaint,, #14 Sealed Document, #9 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) , 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment, #20 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es), #12 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #15 Sealed Document,, #7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 via Publication (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA re #13 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, #8 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION For Entry Of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, And Order Restraining Transfer Of Assets , #10 Order on Motion to Seal, #17 Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal , #1 Complaint,, #12 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #15 Sealed Document,, upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 1, 2019 Filing 24 Clerk's Notice of Compliance re #23 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (cbr)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Unseal. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order of Dismissal of Defendant Number 61. Approving #19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Dismissing without prejudice Defendant mojojewelry_yw. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to BRINGU, Biliatea, BlackkkkkkkHack, Byqone, Charles WesT, Correst, D.B.MOOD Jewelry's Store, DDeper, DENNES, DUOPIAN, Excow Jewelry, Fashionable boutique, Fineog668, GETUPBA, Golden Shopping, Hairbeauty LLC, HouLily, Hugbo, HuoHim, KLGhskjfkd806, KingFast SSD, LOPONS, Lolliper147, LonelyOceann, NUTLCE, Only Store24, Pyzer, Sland jewelry, TQ-ip3w, Tandider Supply, Tooffee, Ulian, XUELE, YANGANG, YINGZHOULIN, YJIAN, Yetss478, Youth Tree, ZLL-OTO, ZOSHOP, amir2010190_1, artistic_glass, bangkun822_9, beautyeshop, blues51, carryleen, chengdushijingxingkangbaozhuangzhipinyouxiangongsi, choi_diamondandgoldph, coolmart00, cullture, danostore, du mei, fashionintrand, frcise03-2, globalm-37, hamab74, hotjewelrysaler, huanying6, hy168, jim-fashion.store, kaimap, keguoli_20, kirshe-18, likesu_34, limingai, linh_store, littlefaerie, lixiaoxia8888, lubinhanMMG, luxe_labels, majestic.brands, miloais.my, mocc20, mojojewelry_yw, myaccessoriess, myplum, nguye-4335, quietwell, rbeagvwesdbresd, rkingsales, s9-pen.store, shenjinqi, shenzen_china, shizongmaoyi, shop_pens, shopmoom, sonyst16, soso1993, sunhuiisDADY, suningyigounvzhang, suntreestore, th-161105, thomapeas26, vadov-94, wangwangh, whillows, woopishmonk, xhgroup85-shop, z_li7851, zfyyouth0104. (cbr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Gaffigan, Stephen)
June 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, of Defendant Number 61 by Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaffigan, Stephen)
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Biliatea, BRINGU, Byqone, Charles WesT, chengdushijingxingkangbaozhuangzhipinyouxiangongsi, Correst, cullture, D.B.MOOD Jewelry's Store, DDeper, DENNES, du mei, DUOPIAN, Excow Jewelry, Fineog668, GETUPBA, Golden Shopping, Hairbeauty LLC, HouLily, Hugbo, HuoHim, kaimap, KingFast SSD, Lolliper147, LOPONS, lubinhanMMG, NUTLCE, Only Store24, Pyzer, quietwell, shizongmaoyi, Sland jewelry, Tooffee, TQ-ip3w, Ulian, whillows, XUELE, YANGANG, Yetss478, Youth Tree, ZLL-OTO, ZOSHOP, amir2010190_1, artistic_glass, bangkun822_9, beautyeshop, blues51, coolmart00, danostore, frcise03-2, globalm-37, hamab74, hotjewelrysaler, jim-fashion.store, keguoli_20, kirshe-18, likesu_34, linh_store, littlefaerie, miloais.my, mocc20, mojojewelry_yw, myaccessoriess, nguye-4335, rkingsales, s9-pen.store, shop_pens, shopmoom, sonyst16, suntree*store, th-161105, thomapeas26, vadov-94, xhgroup85-shop, choi_diamondandgoldph, fashionintrand, luxe_labels, majestic.brands, shenzen_china, BlackkkkkkkHack, carryleen, Fashionable boutique, huanying6, hy168, KLGhskjfkd806, limingai, lixiaoxia8888, LonelyOceann, myplum, rbeagvwesdbresd, shenjinqi, soso1993, sunhuiisDADY, suningyigounvzhang, Tandider Supply, wangwangh, woopishmonk, YINGZHOULIN, YJIAN, z_li7851 and zfyyouth0104. (Gaffigan, Stephen)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal by Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Filing Bond- Seizure Bond BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA Approved by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (mee) Modified title text on 6/21/2019 (asl).
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 Sealed Document Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief by Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Amended Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Cartier Trademarks, #2 Exhibit 2 to the Amended Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Montblanc Trademarks, #3 Exhibit 3 to the Amended Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Panerai Trademarks, #4 Exhibit 4 to the Amended Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Van Cleef Trademarks) (Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified to unseal per DE #23 on 7/1/2019 (cbr).
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 Sealed Document by Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A to Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief) (Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified to unseal per DE #23 on 7/1/2019 (cbr).
June 19, 2019 Set Sealed Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/11/2019 01:15 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. (dj) Modified to unseal per DE #23 on 7/1/2019 (cbr).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT, Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (dj) Modified to unseal per DE #23 on 7/1/2019 (cbr).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Authorizing alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3)granting #9 Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (dj) Modified to unseal per DE #23 on 7/1/2019 (cbr).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (dj)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) by Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified to unseal per DE #23 on 7/1/2019 (cbr).
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION For Entry Of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, And Order Restraining Transfer Of Assets by Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emma-Jane Tritton in Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support Thereof, #3 Declaration of Kathleen Burns in Support Thereof, #4 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #5 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #6 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #7 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #8 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified to unseal per DE #23 on 7/1/2019 (cbr).
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaffigan, Stephen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie Financiere Richemont SA for Cartier International A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Van Cleef & Arpels SA (Gaffigan, Stephen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 3 Form AO 120/121. Document Restricted Due to Error; (mee) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (asl).
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 CORRECTED FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11735465, filed by Van Cleef & Arpels SA, Cartier International A.G., Officine Panerai A.G., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Cartier Trademarks, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Montblanc Trademarks, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Panerai Trademarks, #5 Exhibit 4 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Van Cleef Trademarks)(Gaffigan, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cartier International A.G. et al v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cartier International A.G.
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Officine Panerai A.G.
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Cleef & Arpels SA
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montblanc-Simplo GMBH
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: luxe_labels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HouLily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: frcise03-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: du mei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mojojewelry_yw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rkingsales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wangwangh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLGhskjfkd806
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: blues51
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bangkun822_9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kaimap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mocc20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XUELE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: myaccessoriess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biliatea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: beautyeshop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: amir2010190_1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: thomapeas26
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TQ-ip3w
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZOSHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fashionable boutique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hotjewelrysaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rbeagvwesdbresd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lolliper147
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: limingai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shizongmaoyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xhgroup85-shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nguye-4335
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shop_pens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youth Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOPONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: myplum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lubinhanMMG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GETUPBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tandider Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: choi_diamondandgoldph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: keguoli_20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lixiaoxia8888
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yetss478
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kirshe-18
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shopmoom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excow Jewelry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUTLCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sland jewelry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shenzen_china
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HuoHim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LonelyOceann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: danostore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byqone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: z_li7851
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fineog668
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YJIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: th-161105
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: suningyigounvzhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sonyst16
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Only Store24
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KingFast SSD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fashionintrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zfyyouth0104
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jim-fashion.store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZLL-OTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRINGU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: luxelabels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles WesT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vadov-94
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: miloais.my
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: likesu_34
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: huanying6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hamab74
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: woopishmonk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YANGANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sunhuiisDADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: carryleen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: artistic_glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.B.MOOD Jewelry's Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cullture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: littlefaerie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUOPIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: whillows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: suntree*store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YINGZHOULIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: coolmart00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hairbeauty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tooffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chengdushijingxingkangbaozhuangzhipinyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: linh_store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hy168
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Shopping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: s9-pen.store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: quietwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDeper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: soso1993
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: globalm-37
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shenjinqi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: majestic.brands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlackkkkkkkHack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?