HERCULANO-ALVES v. TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES
Defendant: CORAL POINTE ASSOCIATION, INC. and TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A.
Case Number: 0:2019cv61498
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Offer of Judgment) (Card, Jack)
August 6, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Compliance by TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A. re #16 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,, Set/Reset Deadlines, (Lokeinsky, Jessica)
August 6, 2019 Filing 27 Defendant's RESPONSE to #20 Statement of Claim by TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A.. (Lokeinsky, Jessica)
August 6, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Compliance by CORAL POINTE ASSOCIATION, INC. re #16 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,, Set/Reset Deadlines, (Lokeinsky, Jessica)
August 6, 2019 Filing 25 Defendant's RESPONSE to #20 Statement of Claim by CORAL POINTE ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Lokeinsky, Jessica)
August 2, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, ( Responses due by 8/16/2019), MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law in the alternative by CORAL POINTE ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lokeinsky, Jessica)
August 2, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A.. (Lokeinsky, Jessica)
July 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Robyn Lokeinsky on behalf of CORAL POINTE ASSOCIATION, INC., TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A.. Attorney Jessica Robyn Lokeinsky added to party CORAL POINTE ASSOCIATION, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Robyn Lokeinsky added to party TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A. (pty:dft). (Lokeinsky, Jessica)
July 23, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Compliance as to Court Order ECF No 16 by JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES (Card, Jack)
July 23, 2019 Filing 20 Statement of: Claim by JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES (Card, Jack)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Defendants CORAL POINTE ASSOCIATION, INC. and TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A. must respond to the Complaint by August 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/23/2019. (chd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by CORAL POINTE ASSOCIATION, INC., TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brennan, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel M. Brennan on behalf of CORAL POINTE ASSOCIATION, INC., TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A.. Attorney Daniel M. Brennan added to party CORAL POINTE ASSOCIATION, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M. Brennan added to party TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A. (pty:dft). (Brennan, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES (Card, Jack)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES (Card, Jack)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES. CORAL POINTE ASSOCIATION, INC. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process as to Coral Pointe Association, Inc.)(Card, Jack)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES. TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Process as to Tucker & Lokeinsky, P.A.)(Card, Jack)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to CORAL POINTE ASSOCIATION, INC., TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A.. (lh)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) as to Coral Pointe Association, Inc. by JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) as to Coral Pointe Association, Inc.) (Card, Jack)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) as to Tucker & Lokeinsky, P.A. by JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES re #1 Complaint, filed by JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) as to Tucker & Lokeinsky, P.A.) (Card, Jack)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Striking 5 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks as to CM/ECF [1-3] Coral Pointe Assoc., Inc. by JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES (Card, Jack)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Striking 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) as CM/ECF [1-2] Tucker & Lokeinsky, P.A. by JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES (Card, Jack)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING by JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Card, Jack) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (vmz).
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es). Summons issued in error -return address is not listed . (vmz)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed (vmz)
June 17, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 3 [service] restricted/sealed until further notice. (vmz)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CORAL POINTE ASSOCIATION, INC., TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11735653, filed by JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) as to TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A., #3 Summon(s) as to CORAL POINTE ASSOCIATION, INC.)(Card, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERCULANO-ALVES v. TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANIGLEISON HERCULANO-ALVES
Represented By: Jack Dennis Card, Jr.
Represented By: Darren R. Newhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORAL POINTE ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Jessica Robyn Lokeinsky
Represented By: Daniel M. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TUCKER & LOKEINSKY, P.A.
Represented By: Jessica Robyn Lokeinsky
Represented By: Daniel M. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?