Chanel, Inc. v. 7areplica.ru et al

Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Defendant: ecglobaltrade.ru, replicashop.com.pk, fashionhandbags.cn, bag8clothing.ru, luxurystores.cn, borsaitalian.it, getdiscountbags.cn, dopestkickz.ru, borseguida.it, bagaaa.cn, vancofashion.cn, buypurse.cn, ts-station.co, puretime01.co, aaagoodsbay.ru, bags-women.cn, friulfin.it, modacina.ru, fashionwind.ru, luxurypurses.ru, bynike.cn, luxurybagsoutlet.cn, luxurybrandshop.ru, replicastore.com.pk, uubags.ru, torobravos.co, luxuryvip.ru, luxurystorex.cn, shinebrands.fr, primestuff.ru, modaonline.cn, greatmall8.ru, ts-watches.co, 7areplica.ru, einsteinbagels.cn, handbag, perfectkickz.ru, luxurybagsbrand.cn, willispub.de, aaatradeplaza.ru, aartlusedlip.nl, outletborse.ru, handluxurybags.cn, luxurybagsforless.cn, jewls.ru, repwatchesus.cn, store, tonybags.ru, rep-lica.ru, kspbag.cn, trade, by-nike.cn, vogueluxury.cn, vancofashion.ru, zbags.ru, replicabagsshop.ru, puretime-real.co, bagsaddiction.cn, topluxurybags.cn, puretimereplica.co, purseaaa.cn, bagvalley.se, myluxurybags.cn, myluxurybrand.ru, sellgooditems.ru, luxury-purse.ru, hishirts.ru, bags7.ru, facebags.ru, offeraaa.ru, coravalves.it, sgbag.ru, vancomall.cn, intimewatches.co, myabag.cn, gogokickz.cn, bodjean.ru, dizmag-online.ru and hothandbag
Case Number: 0:2019cv61532
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 29 Final Default Judgment And Permanent Injunction. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. All pending Motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER On Motion For Entry Of Final Default Judgment. ORDER granting #27 Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment Against Defendants. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
July 31, 2019 Filing 27 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendants and Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan In Support Of Motion for Final Default Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Final Default Judgment, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Final Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ON DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROCEDURE re #25 Clerks Entry of Default, Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (pes)
July 24, 2019 Filing 25 Clerks Entry of Default as to herein, the Individuals, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A - Motions Terminated: #24 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 7/24/2019. (dj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2019: #1 Schedule "A") (dj).
July 23, 2019 Filing 24 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to All Defendants by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support of Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 23, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #19 Order on Ex Parte Motion via Publication (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 23, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #19 Order on Ex Parte Motion upon Defendants via Registrar (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 23, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #19 Order on Ex Parte Motion upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 23, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Chanel, Inc.. All Defendants served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified text on 7/23/2019 (kpe).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Motion Hearing held on 7/3/2019 re #5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION For Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Chanel, Inc. Total time in court: 10 minutes. Defendants did not appear. Order to follow. Attorney Appearance: Virgilio Gigante, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mpn)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Chanel, Inc. Of E-Mail Inquiry Received From Defendant Number 3 In Connection With Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Notice of Email Inquiry) (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION For Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof, 10 Notice of Compliance, #11 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es), #12 Clerk's Notice (Other), #3 Form AO 120/121, #8 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #9 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION For Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process On Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) And Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof, #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, #1 Complaint, via Publication (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION For Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof, #8 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #1 Complaint, upon Defendants via Registrar (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION For Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof, #8 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, #1 Complaint, upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to all Defendants. (kpe)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING BOND (jao) Modified on 6/26/2019 (jao).
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Chanel, Inc. re #9 Order on Ex Parte Motion (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) combined) (Gaffigan, Stephen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Unsealing all docket entries in this case pursuant to DE #8 Order. (mc)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Ex Parte Motion to Authorize Alternate Service of Process. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Setting Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. #5 , is GRANTED. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Beth Bloom. The Clerk is directed to UNSEAL all docket entries in this case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION For Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process On Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) And Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan In Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified by Unsealing per DE #8 Order on 6/25/2019 (mc).
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION For Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Bleys In Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan In Support Thereof, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified by Unsealing per DE #8 Order on 6/25/2019 (mc).
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chanel, Inc. (Gaffigan, Stephen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (kpe)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief And Damages against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11746533, filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Chanel Trademarks, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint - Website Captures (Part 1), #4 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint - Website Captures (Part 2), #5 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint - Website Captures (Part 3))(Gaffigan, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chanel, Inc. v. 7areplica.ru et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ecglobaltrade.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: replicashop.com.pk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fashionhandbags.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bag8clothing.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: luxurystores.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: borsaitalian.it
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: getdiscountbags.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dopestkickz.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: borseguida.it
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bagaaa.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vancofashion.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: buypurse.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ts-station.co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: puretime01.co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aaagoodsbay.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bags-women.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: friulfin.it
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: modacina.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fashionwind.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: luxurypurses.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bynike.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: luxurybagsoutlet.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: luxurybrandshop.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: replicastore.com.pk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: uubags.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: torobravos.co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: luxuryvip.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: luxurystorex.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shinebrands.fr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: primestuff.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: modaonline.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: greatmall8.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ts-watches.co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7areplica.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: einsteinbagels.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: handbag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: perfectkickz.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: luxurybagsbrand.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: willispub.de
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aaatradeplaza.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aartlusedlip.nl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: outletborse.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: handluxurybags.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: luxurybagsforless.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jewls.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: repwatchesus.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tonybags.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rep-lica.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kspbag.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: trade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: by-nike.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vogueluxury.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vancofashion.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zbags.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: replicabagsshop.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: puretime-real.co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bagsaddiction.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: topluxurybags.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: puretimereplica.co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: purseaaa.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bagvalley.se
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: myluxurybags.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: myluxurybrand.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sellgooditems.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: luxury-purse.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hishirts.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bags7.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: facebags.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: offeraaa.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: coravalves.it
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sgbag.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vancomall.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: intimewatches.co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: myabag.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gogokickz.cn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bodjean.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dizmag-online.ru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hothandbag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?