Gable et al v. PNC Bank, N.A.
Appellee: PNC Bank, N.A.
Appellant: Richard Allen Gable and Georgia Devone Gable
Case Number: 0:2019cv61543
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 9/3/2019. (jc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on June 3, 2019 before Judge John K. Olson, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-9 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette & Mauldin Court Reporters, Inc.. Telephone number: 305-358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2019. (mfe)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on May 6, 2019 before Judge John K. Olson, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-13 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette & Mauldin Court Reporters, Inc.. Telephone number: 305-358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2019. (mfe)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Richard Allen Gable, Georgia Devone Gable (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation, #2 Appellant Statement of Issues, #3 Appellant Designated Items, #4 Appellee Designation, #5 Appellee Designated Items, #6 Appellee Designated Items, #7 Appellee Designated Item, #8 Appellee Designated Item)(mfe)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lars Olgerts Bodnieks on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A.. Attorney Lars Olgerts Bodnieks added to party PNC Bank, N.A.(pty:e). (Bodnieks, Lars)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jua)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Richard Allen Gable, Georgia Devone Gable (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(smd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 15-24667-JKO, filed by Richard Allen Gable, Georgia Devone Gable.(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gable et al v. PNC Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Arthur Charles Neiwirth
Represented By: Lars Olgerts Bodnieks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard Allen Gable
Represented By: Barry Steven Mittelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Georgia Devone Gable
Represented By: Barry Steven Mittelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?