Michael Kors, L.L.C. v. the Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Plaintiff: Michael Kors, L.L.C.
Defendant: the Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", jiangailv, jackhandsmooth, edsofart, GSLS and xinniandaolai2471
Case Number: 0:2019cv61559
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to GSLS, edsofart, jackhandsmooth, jiangailv, xinniandaolai2471. (lbc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Michael Kors, L.L.C. re #7 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Proposed Summon(s)) (Daley, Christine)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Alternate Service of Process. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) by Michael Kors, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine Ann Daley in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Christine Ann Daley, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Alternate Service of Process)(Daley, Christine)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by Michael Kors, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to the Amended Complaint)(Daley, Christine)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Michael Kors, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Michael Kors (USA) Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Capri Holdings Limited for Michael Kors, L.L.C. (Daley, Christine)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (kpe) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/24/2019) (kpe).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11754268, filed by Michael Kors, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint)(Gaffigan, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Kors, L.L.C. v. the Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: the Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jiangailv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jackhandsmooth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: edsofart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xinniandaolai2471
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kors, L.L.C.
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Christine Ann Daley
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?