Viscuso v. Health Advisors of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Michael Viscuso
Defendant: Sergio Ortiz, Michael T. Smith, Jr. and Health Advisors of America, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv61570
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
2 Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 8 Order to Show Cause,, by Joseph Michael Viscuso. (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
August 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE 8 : Show Cause Response/Dismissal Documents due by 8/19/2019. (lk)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On June 26, 2019, this Court entered its initial Order, which required the parties to submit appropriate dismissal papers within ten (10) calendar days of notifying the Court that the case has settled. See [DE 6]. On July 28, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Settlement. See [DE 7]. However, as of the date of this Order, a stipulation, notice, or motion for dismissal has not been filed with the Court. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that no later than August 19, 2019, the parties shall either file the appropriate dismissal documents or show cause why they have not been filed. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/12/2019. (mkz)
July 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Joseph Michael Viscuso (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES IN FLSA CASES Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 6/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (bms)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Health Advisors of America, Inc., Sergio Ortiz, Michael T. Smith, Jr. (pes)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11755333, filed by Joseph Michael Viscuso. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Statement of Claim)(Kozolchyk, Elliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viscuso v. Health Advisors of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Advisors of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Michael Viscuso
Represented By: Elliot Ari Kozolchyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?