Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc. v. Avila et al

Plaintiff: Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc.
Defendant: Patricia Cohen, America Avila and America Digital Productions, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv61652
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Alicia O Valle
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Set Answer Due Deadline per DE #26 Order: America Digital Productions, LLC response due 9/19/2019; America Avila response due 9/19/2019; Patricia Cohen response due 9/19/2019. (kpe)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OMNIBUS ORDER REGARDING CLERK'S DEFAULT AND DEFENSE COUNSEL. Deadline to obtain new counsel 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 8/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
August 21, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 Corrected MOTION to Vacate #21 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc.. Replies due by 8/28/2019. (Bradley, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Patricia Cohen, America Avila, and America Digital Productions, LLC., by Matthew S. Nelles and by Euyelit Adriana Moreno Kostencki for / by America Digital Productions, LLC, America Avila, Patricia Cohen. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Moreno Kostencki, Euyelit)
August 7, 2019 Filing 23 Corrected MOTION to Vacate #21 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by America Digital Productions, LLC, America Avila, Patricia Cohen. Responses due by 8/21/2019 (Moreno Kostencki, Euyelit)
August 7, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #21 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by America Digital Productions, LLC, America Avila, Patricia Cohen. Attorney Euyelit Adriana Moreno Kostencki added to party America Digital Productions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Euyelit Adriana Moreno Kostencki added to party America Avila(pty:dft), Attorney Euyelit Adriana Moreno Kostencki added to party Patricia Cohen(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/21/2019 (Moreno Kostencki, Euyelit)
August 6, 2019 Filing 21 VACATED Clerks Entry of Default as to Patricia Cohen, America Avila, America Digital Productions, LLC. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/6/2019. (kpe) Modified on 8/29/2019 per DE #26 Order (kpe).
August 6, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to America Digital Productions, LLC, America Avila, Patricia Cohen by Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order clerks default)(Bradley, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to America Digital Productions, LLC, America Avila, Patricia Cohen by Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc.. (Bradley, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Striking by Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc. (Bradley, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 Clerks Notice to Filer re DE #16 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default . Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (kpe)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 STRICKEN MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to America Digital Productions, LLC, America Avila, Patricia Cohen by Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc.. (Bradley, John) Modified on 8/6/2019 per DE #18 Notice of Striking (kpe).
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #9 Certificate of Service, #10 Certificate of Service, #11 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 12 Summons Returned Executed, 13 Summons Returned Executed, 14 Summons Returned Executed. It is not necessary to refile this document. (kpe)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc.. Patricia Cohen served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. See DE #11 for image. (kpe)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc.. America Avila served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019.See DE #10 for image. (kpe)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc.. America Digital Productions, LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. See DE #9 for image. (kpe)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc. Proof of Service (Bradley, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc. Proof of Service (Bradley, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc. Proof of Service (Bradley, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 First MOTION for Courts Entry of Default pursuant to Federal Debt Collections Procedures Act (FDCPA) Title 28, U.S.C., Section 3205(6) as to All Defendants. Proposed Clerk's Default Docketed as Main Document; It is not necessary to refile this document; refer to CM/ECF Administrative Procedures for future filings. (kpe)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to America Digital Productions, LLC, America Avila, Patricia Cohen - Motions Terminated: #6 Motion for Courts Entry of Default (FDCPA). Reason: Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed OR Waiver of Service Executed - has NOT been entered on docket. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 7/31/2019. (kpe)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 STRICKEN First MOTION for Courts Entry of Default pursuant to Federal Debt Collections Procedures Act (FDCPA) Title 28, U.S.C., Section 3205(6) as to All Defendants by Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc.. (Bradley, John) Modified on 8/6/2019 per DE #18 Notice of Striking (kpe).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to America Digital Productions, LLC, America Avila, Patricia Cohen. (kpe)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (kpe)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11784790, filed by Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) American Digital Summons, #2 Summon(s) Avila Summons, #3 Summon(s) Cohen Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit)(Bradley, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc. v. Avila et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Cohen
Represented By: Euyelit Adriana Moreno Kostencki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America Avila
Represented By: Euyelit Adriana Moreno Kostencki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America Digital Productions, LLC
Represented By: Euyelit Adriana Moreno Kostencki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organizacion Miss America Latina, Inc.
Represented By: John Francis Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?