urbanlip.com ltd v. Dress Rehearsal Corp
Plaintiff: urbanlip.com ltd
Defendant: Dress Rehearsal Corp.; and Does 1 through 10 inclusive and Dress Rehearsal Corp
Case Number: 0:2019cv61657
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re #9 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Dress Rehearsal Corp. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Dress Rehearsal Corp by urbanlip.com ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mathew K. Higbee, #2 [Proposed] Entry of Default)(Higbee, Melissa)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 7 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default. Document Filed in Wrong Case; Document restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled in correct case # 19-cv-60247. (cbr)
July 12, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 7 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (cbr)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by urbanlip.com ltd. Dress Rehearsal Corp served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Higbee, Melissa)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by urbanlip.com ltd identifying Other Affiliate PicRight Ltd. for urbanlip.com ltd (Higbee, Melissa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (copy mailed to copyright office) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee) Text Modified on 7/6/2019 (mee).
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dress Rehearsal Corp. (mee)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Dress Rehearsal Corp.; and Does 1 through 10 inclusive. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11788055, filed by urbanlip.com ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - C, #2 Summon(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Higbee, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: urbanlip.com ltd v. Dress Rehearsal Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dress Rehearsal Corp.; and Does 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dress Rehearsal Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: urbanlip.com ltd
Represented By: Melissa Ann Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?