Reeds Jewelers, Inc. v. droeb.com et al
Plaintiff: Reeds Jewelers, Inc.
Defendant: droeb.com, reeds.melodifalan.com, cougrz.com and benblu.com
Case Number: 0:2019cv61710
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (btr)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery for Order authorizing Plaintiff to Initiate Discovery by Reeds Jewelers, Inc.. Responses due by 8/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit declaration of stephen m. gaffigan, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Reeds Jewelers, Inc.. cougrz.com served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019; droeb.com served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to cougrz.com, droeb.com. (lk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Reeds Jewelers, Inc. re #6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Motion for an order authorizing alternate service of process on Defendants pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3). Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for an order authorizing alternate service of process on Defendants pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) by Reeds Jewelers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reeds Jewelers, Inc. (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11803943, filed by Reeds Jewelers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - trademark regs, #3 Exhibit 2 - cite captures)(Gaffigan, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeds Jewelers, Inc. v. droeb.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: droeb.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: reeds.melodifalan.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cougrz.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: benblu.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reeds Jewelers, Inc.
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?