Chanel, Inc. v. 8creplicachanel.com et al
Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Defendant: 8creplicachanel.com, 012shop.com, buyreplicasonline.com, ahandbag.top, clearanceshoesshop.com, cheapniketanjun.us, handbage.top, cheapshoeswebsites.com, louisvuittonoutlet.top, pingreplicahandbags.com, handbageshop.top, louisvuittonhand-bags.top, getfloes.com, shoxoutletshoesstore.com, replicapursesstore.com, essenceofluxury.net, cheapnikedunk.us, fakessaleshop.com, lvchanelbags.com, lvusa.top, cheapairmaxforsale.us, fabbag.net, designerinspiredclothes.com, chanelbagusa.com, watchpam.com, hanghieureplica.com, aaachanelshop.com, gohbee.com, bettyvip.com, louisvuittonshops.top, shophandbags.top, happyaaareplica.com, intime04.co, baglvstores.top, chanelhunter.com, replicasalesshop.com, ebuypurses12a.com, baglvstore.top, fashion8shops.net, cheapairjordan, chanelguccius.com, cnshopzone.co, bagstores.top, righexcellentthandbags.com, wholly-jo.co.uk, lvbagsgb.top, cheapyeezy.us, fakesoulet.com, chanel-outlet.co, cheapnikesb.us, eonbags.com, cheapstansmith.us, fakemarketonline.com, forreplicasell.com, shopping-handbags.top, glamcc.me, bagestore.top, cocojew.com, handbagestore.top, inbag.top, lovebrandbagg.com, replicabagsweb.com, besthandbagsuu.com, fakesmarket.com, shoeswholesale.us, pursesreplicas.com and cheapadidassuperstar.com
Case Number: 0:2019cv61719
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 26 FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Plaintiff's Motion for Final Default Judgment Against Defendants. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco)
August 26, 2019 Filing 24 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendants and Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan In Support of Motion for Final Default Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment Against Defendants, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Final Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
August 14, 2019 Filing 23 Clerks Entry of Default as to 012shop.com, 8creplicachanel.com, ahandbag.top, bettyvip.com, buyreplicasonline.com, chanel-outlet.co, chanelguccius.com, chanelhunter.com, clearanceshoesshop.com, cnshopzone.co, cocojew.com, designerinspiredclothes.com, ebuypurses12a.com, eonbags.com, essenceofluxury.net, fabbag.net, fashion8shops.net, getfloes.com, glamcc.me, hanghieureplica.com, intime04.co, lovebrandbagg.com, righexcellentthandbags.com, shopping-handbags.top, watchpam.com, wholly-jo.co.uk - Motions Terminated: #22 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/14/2019. (pes)
August 13, 2019 Filing 22 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to 012shop.com, 8creplicachanel.com, ahandbag.top, bettyvip.com, buyreplicasonline.com, chanel-outlet.co, chanelguccius.com, chanelhunter.com, clearanceshoesshop.com, cnshopzone.co, cocojew.com, designerinspiredclothes.com, ebuypurses12a.com, eonbags.com, essenceofluxury.net, fabbag.net, fashion8shops.net, getfloes.com, glamcc.me, hanghieureplica.com, intime04.co, lovebrandbagg.com, righexcellentthandbags.com, shopping-handbags.top, watchpam.com, wholly-jo.co.uk by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support of Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #17 Preliminary Injunction via Publication (Gaffigan, Stephen)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #17 Preliminary Injunction upon Defendants via Registrar (Gaffigan, Stephen)
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #17 Preliminary Injunction upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Chanel, Inc.. 012shop.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; 8creplicachanel.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; ahandbag.top served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; bettyvip.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; buyreplicasonline.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; chanel-outlet.co served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; chanelguccius.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; chanelhunter.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; clearanceshoesshop.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; cnshopzone.co served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; cocojew.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; designerinspiredclothes.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; ebuypurses12a.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; eonbags.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; essenceofluxury.net served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; fabbag.net served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; fashion8shops.net served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; getfloes.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; glamcc.me served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; hanghieureplica.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; intime04.co served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; lovebrandbagg.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; righexcellentthandbags.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; shopping-handbags.top served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; watchpam.com served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019; wholly-jo.co.uk served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Smith: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 7/29/2019. Court granted preliminary injunction, Order to follow. No Defendants were present during hearing. Plaintiff Counsel of record present during proceedings. Total time in court: 10 minutes. Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. (dco)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, 9 Notice of Compliance, #5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #10 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es), #8 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #1 Complaint, #7 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #3 Form AO 120/121, #12 Bond via Publication (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #1 Complaint, #7 Order on Ex Parte Motion, upon Defendants via Registrar (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel, Inc. re #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, #8 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #1 Complaint, #7 Order on Ex Parte Motion, upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by Chanel, Inc. Approved by Judge Rodney Smith (pcs) Modified on 7/17/2019 (mr1).
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lbc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Chanel, Inc. re #8 Order on Ex Parte Motion (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) combined) (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice of Compliance re #7 Order on Ex Parte Motion, (cbr)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Ex Parte Motion for Order Authorizing Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3). Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte Application For Entry of Temporary Restraining Order. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/29/2019 09:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit 1 attached to the Gaffigan Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified to unseal per DE #7 on 7/16/2019 (cbr).
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Bleys in Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support Thereof, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified to unseal per DE #7 on 7/16/2019 (cbr).
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chanel, Inc. (Gaffigan, Stephen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (cds)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief And Damages against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11805936, filed by Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Chanel Trademarks, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint - Website Captures (Part 1), #4 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint - Website Captures (Part 2), #5 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint - Website Captures (Part 3))(Gaffigan, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chanel, Inc. v. 8creplicachanel.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8creplicachanel.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 012shop.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: buyreplicasonline.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ahandbag.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: clearanceshoesshop.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheapniketanjun.us
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: handbage.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheapshoeswebsites.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: louisvuittonoutlet.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pingreplicahandbags.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: handbageshop.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: louisvuittonhand-bags.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: getfloes.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shoxoutletshoesstore.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: replicapursesstore.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: essenceofluxury.net
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheapnikedunk.us
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fakessaleshop.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lvchanelbags.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lvusa.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheapairmaxforsale.us
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fabbag.net
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: designerinspiredclothes.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chanelbagusa.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: watchpam.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hanghieureplica.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aaachanelshop.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gohbee.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bettyvip.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: louisvuittonshops.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shophandbags.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: happyaaareplica.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: intime04.co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: baglvstores.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chanelhunter.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: replicasalesshop.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ebuypurses12a.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: baglvstore.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fashion8shops.net
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheapairjordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chanelguccius.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cnshopzone.co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bagstores.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: righexcellentthandbags.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wholly-jo.co.uk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lvbagsgb.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheapyeezy.us
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fakesoulet.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chanel-outlet.co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheapnikesb.us
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eonbags.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheapstansmith.us
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fakemarketonline.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: forreplicasell.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shopping-handbags.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: glamcc.me
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bagestore.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cocojew.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: handbagestore.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: inbag.top
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lovebrandbagg.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: replicabagsweb.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: besthandbagsuu.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fakesmarket.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shoeswholesale.us
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pursesreplicas.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheapadidassuperstar.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanel, Inc.
Represented By: T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?