Gaudreau v. Gonzales et al
Appellee: Hideaway Yacht Sales, Inc., Tom Gonzales, TG Investments, LLC and Scott N. Brown
Appellant: Andre Gaudreau
Case Number: 0:2019cv61866
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 Bankruptcy Supplemental Transmittal of RESTRICTED Exhibit(s)/Documents to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Andre Gaudreau (Attachments: #1 Appellee REDACTED Copy of Social Security Statement Form 121 -BKC DE 6, #2 Appellee UNREDACTED Copy of Social Security Statement Form 121 - BKC DE 13)(jc)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 10/7/2019. (jc)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 7/10/2019 before Judge Raymond B. Ray, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-32 pages, Court Reporter: Margaret Franzen. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2019. (smd)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 7/25/2019 before Judge Raymond B. Ray, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-34 pages, Court Reporter: Cheryl L. Jenkins. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2019. (smd)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 7/10/2019 before Judge Raymond B. Ray, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-32 pages, Court Reporter: Margaret Franzen. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2019. (smd)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 5/29/2019 before Judge Raymond B. Ray, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-19 pages, Court Reporter: Cheryl L. Jenkins. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2019. (smd)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Andre Gaudreau (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Designation - Appellant, #3 Designation - Appellee's List of Items, #4 Designation - Appellee Part 1 of 9, #5 Designation - Appellee Part 2 of 9, #6 Designation - Appellee Part 3 of 9, #7 Designation - Appellee Part 4 of 9, #8 Designation - Appellee Part 5 of 9, #9 Designation - Appellee Part 6 of 9, #10 Designation - Appellee Part 7 of 9, #11 Designation - Appellee Part 8 of 9, #12 Designation - Appellee Part 9 of 9)(smd)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Andre Gaudreau (Gelormino, Nicola)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Notice of Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Andre Gaudreau (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(smd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-18236-RBR, filed by Andre Gaudreau.(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaudreau v. Gonzales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hideaway Yacht Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Messana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tom Gonzales
Represented By: Thomas M. Messana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TG Investments, LLC
Represented By: Thomas M. Messana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Scott N. Brown
Represented By: Scott Neil Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Andre Gaudreau
Represented By: Kristopher Aungst
Represented By: Michael C. Foster
Represented By: Nicola Andrea Gelormino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?