PRINE v. LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, et al
Plaintiff: JONATHAN PRINE
Defendant: LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY and Hudson Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv61947
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added JONATHAN PRINE, Orestes Rusty Perez. (Cytryn, Dan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint filed by LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Lavisky, Matthew)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 9/19/2019. (jz)
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS #8 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Hudson Insurance Company. (Berry, Nickolas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Hudson Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Fairfax (US), Inc., Corporate Parent Odyssey Reinsurance Company, Corporate Parent Odyssey US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP, Other Affiliate Nickolas C. Berry, Other Affiliate Stacy Mateu for Hudson Insurance Company (Berry, Nickolas)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS #8 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #13 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint filed by JONATHAN PRINE. Replies due by 9/19/2019. (Cytryn, Dan)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 9/21/2020 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 9/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas). ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by JONATHAN PRINE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cytryn, Dan)
August 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint by LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 9/16/2019 (Lavisky, Matthew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS #8 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Hudson Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/13/2019 (Berry, Nickolas)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTIONS TO DISMISS, denying as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole Paulette Ramos on behalf of LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Attorney Nicole Paulette Ramos added to party LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft). (Ramos, Nicole)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM As to Count II filed by JONATHAN PRINE. Replies due by 8/27/2019. (Cytryn, Dan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JONATHAN PRINE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Remedy Notice, #2 Exhibit Return receipt, #3 Exhibit Hudson insurance policy)(Cytryn, Dan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AS TO COUNT III by Hudson Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Hudson Policy)(Berry, Nickolas)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM As to Count II by LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Brookins, Starr)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, into CM/ECF. (Brookins, Starr)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (mee)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11869738, filed by LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Motion to Dismiss filed.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A2 - Remaining State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Hudson Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint, #6 Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lavisky, Matthew)Text Modified on 8/2/2019 (mee).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRINE v. LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew John Lavisky
Represented By: Starr Linette Brookins
Represented By: Nicole Paulette Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Company
Represented By: Nickolas Charles Berry
Represented By: Stacy Mateu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN PRINE
Represented By: Dan Cytryn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?