Young et al v. Willingtom Savings Fund Society FSB
Plaintiff: Lecent Jackson and Noel Young
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
Case Number: 0:2019cv61982
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Recommending that the Complaint be DISMISSED, without prejudice, and that all pending motions, including the Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by Plaintiff Noel Young (ECF No. 3), be DENIED as moot. Objections to R&R due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 10/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge For All Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lecept Jackson, Neil Young. (drz)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Willingtom Savings Fund Society FSB. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Neil Young, Lecept Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(drz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al v. Willingtom Savings Fund Society FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lecent Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?