Expert Inspections, LLC v. Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Expert Inspections, LLC
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv62007
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Closing Case. Denied as moot: #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), or In the Alternative MOTION to Change Venue filed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Expert Inspections, LLC. Attorney Yeemee Cheryl Chan added to party Expert Inspections, LLC(pty:pla). (Chan, Yeemee)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), or In the Alternative, MOTION to Change Venue by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declarations Page, #2 Exhibit 2 - FEMA Bulletin W-08019)(Pennekamp, John)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/27/2019 Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ra)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Responses due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Statement of Claim) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11892917, filed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pennekamp, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Expert Inspections, LLC v. Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Expert Inspections, LLC
Represented By: Michael Andrew Feiner
Represented By: Yeemee Cheryl Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John Michael Pennekamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?