Professional Tank Cleaning, Inc. v. JAG INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff: Professional Tank Cleaning, Inc.
Defendant: JAG INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 0:2019cv62045
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 22 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Steven R Jaffe. (Ludwin, Adam)
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 Clerks Notice to Filer re #20 Notice (Other). Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the mediator. (pes)
October 10, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Professional Tank Cleaning, Inc.. (Ludwin, Adam)
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Professional Tank Cleaning, Inc. of Selection of Mediator (Ludwin, Adam)
October 4, 2019 Filing 19 Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Professional Tank Cleaning, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Ludwin Law Group, P.A., Other Affiliate Alexander Pellerito for Professional Tank Cleaning, Inc. (Ludwin, Adam)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (Mediation Deadline 3/5/2020.) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 8/11/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 10/25/2019., Expert Discovery due by 2/18/2020., Fact Discovery due by 2/18/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 10/25/2019., Mediation Deadline 3/5/2020., In Limine Motions due by 6/17/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2020., Motions due by 6/17/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/17/2020.) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by JAG INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER)(Osber, Steven)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pes)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 Initial Disclosure(s) by Professional Tank Cleaning, Inc. (Ludwin, Adam)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Professional Tank Cleaning, Inc. (Ludwin, Adam)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Compliance RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by JAG INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC. (Osber, Steven)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by JAG INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC. CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (Osber, Steven)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 DEFENDANT JAG INDUSTRIES ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by JAG INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Purchase Order Agreement)(Osber, Steven)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) William E. Reid. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance by Professional Tank Cleaning, Inc. re #5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, (Ludwin, Adam)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for WILLIAM E. REID, ESQ.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11974038 by JAG INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.. Responses due by 9/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification CERTIFICATE OF WILLIAM E. REID, #2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER ON WILLIAM E REID MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE)(Osber, Steven)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Harris Osber on behalf of JAG INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.. Attorney Steven Harris Osber added to party JAG INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.(pty:dft). (Osber, Steven)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/28/2019) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JAG INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC. (pes)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JAG INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.. (jao)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAG INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11903368, filed by Professional Tank Cleaning, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s))(Ludwin, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Professional Tank Cleaning, Inc. v. JAG INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAG INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: William E. Reid
Represented By: Steven Harris Osber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Professional Tank Cleaning, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Michael Ludwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?