Gaddis v. Just Brands USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jesse S. Gaddis
Defendant: SSGI Financial Services, Inc., Just Brands FL, LLC and Just Brands USA, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv62067
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jesse S. Gaddis. SSGI Financial Services, Inc. waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Bursor, Scott)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jesse S. Gaddis. Just Brands FL, LLC waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Bursor, Scott)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jesse S. Gaddis. Just Brands USA, Inc. waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Bursor, Scott)
September 10, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: All Defendants., Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings All Defendants.( Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/27/2019) per DE 9 (cbr)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the #1 Complaint by no later than November 18, 2019. The parties shall comply with the Court's #7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements by no later than November 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/10/2019. (dco)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jesse S. Gaddis. Responses due by 9/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bursor, Scott)
September 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/2/2019. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #4 #5 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Frederick J. Klorczyk III and Neal J. Deckant. Local counsel did not consent to electronically serve all documents and things that may be served electronically or consent to serving documents in compliance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. A sample motion can be found on the Court's website. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/22/2019. (dco)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Neal J. Deckant. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11919065 by Jesse S. Gaddis. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Bursor, Scott)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Frederick J. Klorczyk III. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11919035 by Jesse S. Gaddis. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Bursor, Scott)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Just Brands FL, LLC, Just Brands USA, Inc., SSGI Financial Services, Inc. (amb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Just Brands FL, LLC, Just Brands USA, Inc., SSGI Financial Services, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11910747, filed by Jesse S. Gaddis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A)(Bursor, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaddis v. Just Brands USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSGI Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Brands FL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Brands USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse S. Gaddis
Represented By: Scott A Bursor
Represented By: Neal Jamison Deckant
Represented By: Frederick J. Klorczyk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?