Evlution Nutrition, LLC v. SERIOUS NUTRITION SOLUTIONS, LLC
Plaintiff: Evlution Nutrition, LLC
Defendant: SERIOUS NUTRITION SOLUTIONS, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv62081
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (amb)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), all claims in this action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court SHALL administratively close this case. All future hearings are CANCELLED and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Evlution Nutrition, LLC (Heitner, Darren)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Entry of Default as to Serious Nutrition Solutions, LLC Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/2/2019. (amb)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Clerk to Enter Default(s) as to SERIOUS NUTRITION SOLUTIONS, LLC, (Plaintiff SHALL file a Motion for Final Default Judgment against Defendant, duly supported by affidavits and other documentation and a proposed Final Order by 10/9/2019.) The Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference in this matter is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Evlution Nutrition, LLC. SERIOUS NUTRITION SOLUTIONS, LLC served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heitner, Darren)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference. Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/4/2019, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 10/1/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (amb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SERIOUS NUTRITION SOLUTIONS, LLC. (amb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SERIOUS NUTRITION SOLUTIONS, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11915495, filed by Evlution Nutrition, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Heitner, Darren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evlution Nutrition, LLC v. SERIOUS NUTRITION SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERIOUS NUTRITION SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evlution Nutrition, LLC
Represented By: Alan Mensa-Wilmot
Represented By: Darren Adam Heitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?