Caplan v. HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP. et al
Plaintiff: Howard Michael Caplan
Defendant: PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC and HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP.
Case Number: 0:2019cv62123
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 24 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC (Buckley, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #22 Motion to Stay Case for Forty-Five Days Pending Early Settlement Discussions. The parties may engage in settlement discussions and the Court encourages same. Moreover, the parties may schedule an early mediation date and the Court encourages same. The Court's Order, ECF No. #10 , establishes another procedure for the parties to meaningfully evaluate the claims and defenses asserted. However, the parties shall adhere to the Court's Scheduling Order, ECF No. #20 , and there is no basis for a stay of the schedule imposed by the Court. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
October 16, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Stay Case for Forty-Five Days Pending Early Settlement Discussions by HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP.. Responses due by 10/30/2019 (Leininger, Carri)
October 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carri S. Leininger on behalf of HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP. (Leininger, Carri)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2019., Discovery due by 1/28/2020., Fact Discovery due by 1/28/2020., Expert Discovery due by 1/28/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 12/9/2019., Mediation Deadline 2/11/2020., In Limine Motions due by 2/19/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 2/19/2020., Motions due by 2/19/2020., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/11/2020., Jury Trial set for 5/26/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 5/19/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 2/11/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP. (Leininger, Carri)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report. See ECF No. #17 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Howard Michael Caplan (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Ronald)
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 Clerks Notice to Filer re #15 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties. (jas)
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Howard Michael Caplan (Stern, Ronald)
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by Howard Michael Caplan. Responses due by 10/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Ronald)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC. (Buckley, Michael)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP.. (Leininger, Carri)
September 25, 2019 Attorney Michael B. Buckley terminated for Defendant Hollywood Chassis Corp. per DE #11 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. (mc)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP. (Leininger, Carri)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER IN ACTIONS BROUGHT UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by All Defendants by September 30, 2019. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Howard Michael Caplan. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP., PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC. Attorney Michael B. Buckley added to party HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael B. Buckley added to party PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Buckley, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Michael Caplan. PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Stern, Ronald)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Michael Caplan. HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Stern, Ronald)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by Ronald E. Stern on behalf of Howard Michael Caplan (Stern, Ronald)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL, SCHEDULING REPORT, AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Verified Certificate of Counsel due on or before September 3, 2019). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP., PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11927171, filed by Howard Michael Caplan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Stern, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caplan v. HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Michael Caplan
Represented By: Ronald E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: Michael B. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP.
Represented By: Michael B. Buckley
Represented By: Carri S. Leininger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?