Chamely v. Homejab, LLC
Plaintiff: Jason Chamely
Defendant: Homejab, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv62125
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Administrative Order Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Homejab, LLC (Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; Homejab, LLC. Answer due 10/2/2019. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Jason Chamely. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Homejab, LLC (Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Homejab, LLC. Attorney Jennifer Olmedo-Rodriguez added to party Homejab, LLC (pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint)(Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 10/2/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jason Chamely. Homejab, LLC served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Shamis, Andrew)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Homejab, LLC. (ar2)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Homejab, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11928181, filed by Jason Chamely. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Shamis, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chamely v. Homejab, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Chamely
Represented By: Garrett O. Berg
Represented By: Scott Adam Edelsberg
Represented By: Jordan David Utanski
Represented By: Andrew John Shamis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homejab, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Olmedo-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?