Fromer v. HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST
Plaintiff: Debra Fromer
Defendant: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST
Case Number: 0:2019cv62271
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST re #13 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Corrected as to Date of Filing Only (Kegley, Eric)
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Richard Lord. (Kegley, Eric)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 5/7/2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the two-week period commencing 7/7/2020 before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 6/30/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A to JSR)(Kegley, Eric)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ail)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST (Kegley, Eric)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Debra Fromer (Silvers, Aaron)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Removal Status Report by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST (Kegley, Eric)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST. (Kegley, Eric)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Failure to file Removal Status Report by September 26, 2019 may result in remand of the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron David Silvers on behalf of Debra Fromer. Attorney Aaron David Silvers added to party Debra Fromer(pty:pla). (Silvers, Aaron)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Debra Fromer v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11976677, filed by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Composite Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Composite Exhibit D)(Harwood, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fromer v. HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST
Represented By: Eric Christian Kegley
Represented By: James Miller Kaplan
Represented By: Susan Banks Harwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Fromer
Represented By: Kevin Joshua Weisser
Represented By: Aaron David Silvers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?