Chase Bank USA, N.A. v. Jacucci et al
Plaintiff: Chase Bank USA, N.A. n/k/a JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., Chase Bank USA, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Defendant: Jessica Jacucci, individually and as former Trustee of the AELJ Irrevocable Trust Series A-2012, Edward Steadman, as Trustee of the AELJ Irrevocable Trust Series A-2012, Joseph Jacucci, jointly and severally, Joseph Jacucci, Edward Steadman and Jessica Jacucci
Case Number: 0:2019cv62318
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 31:3545
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #15 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike #13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. Responses due by 11/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Campbell, Dennis)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jessica Jacucci, Joseph Jacucci. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orth, Scott)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jessica Jacucci. Responses due by 11/20/2019 (Orth, Scott)
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Jessica Jacucci for dates of 12/1/2019 through 1/2/2020 (Orth, Scott)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint,, filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. Replies due by 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Composite Exhibit "A")(Campbell, Dennis)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Defendants Joseph Jacucci and Jessica Jacucci's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their Response on or before November 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Jessica Jacucci, Joseph Jacucci. Attorney Scott Alan Orth added to party Jessica Jacucci(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Alan Orth added to party Joseph Jacucci(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orth, Scott)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, by Edward Steadman. Responses due by 10/29/2019 (pcs)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO VOLUNTEER ATTORNEY PROGRAM. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Joseph Jacucci. (pcs)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 PAPERLESS NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jessica Jacucci, Joseph Jacucci, Edward Steadman. (pcs)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edward Steadman, as Trustee of the AELJ Irrevocable Trust Series A-2012, Jessica Jacucci, individually and as former Trustee of the AELJ Irrevocable Trust Series A-2012, Joseph Jacucci, jointly and severally. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11991943, filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A. n/k/a JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Campbell, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chase Bank USA, N.A. v. Jacucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Jacucci, individually and as former Trustee of the AELJ Irrevocable Trust Series A-2012
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Steadman, as Trustee of the AELJ Irrevocable Trust Series A-2012
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Jacucci, jointly and severally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Jacucci
Represented By: Scott Alan Orth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Jacucci
Represented By: Scott Alan Orth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Bank USA, N.A. n/k/a JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Dennis Michael Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Dennis Michael Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Dennis Michael Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?