Snyder et al v. Greens Road of Florida LLC
Plaintiff: Brook Snyder and Ryan Terry
Defendant: GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv62342
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 18 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Exhibit A)(McManus, John)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Responses due by 11/22/2019. Initial Planning Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) by Brook Snyder, Ryan Terry. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tropin, Daniel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) ( Responses due by 11/8/2019) by GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Exemplar Labels for 250 MG CBD Oil and 300 MG CBD Gummies, #2 Exhibit 2-Exemplar Certificates of Analysis for 250 MG CBD Oil and 300 MG Gummies, #3 Exhibit 3-Exemplar Website Printouts for 250 MG CBD Oil and 300 MG Gummies, #4 Exhibit 4-Ken Mark Declaration)(McManus, John)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint. Answer due 10/25/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth Adrian Horky on behalf of GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC. Attorney Kenneth Adrian Horky added to party GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC(pty:dft). (Horky, Kenneth)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McManus, John)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC (McManus, John)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Luger McManus on behalf of GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC. Attorney John Luger McManus added to party GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC(pty:dft). (McManus, John)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Melissa S. Weiner. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Joseph C. Bourne. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Melissa S. Weiner. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12047511 by Brook Snyder, Ryan Terry. Responses due by 10/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tropin, Daniel)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joseph C. Bourne. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12047498 by Brook Snyder, Ryan Terry. Responses due by 10/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tropin, Daniel)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference, ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 11/1/2019, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2019 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Brook Snyder, Ryan Terry. GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Ostrow, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC. (kpe)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11999469, filed by Brook Snyder, Ryan Terry. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ostrow, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder et al v. Greens Road of Florida LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREEN ROADS OF FLORIDA LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Adrian Horky
Represented By: John Luger McManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brook Snyder
Represented By: Joshua Robert Levine
Represented By: Daniel Edward Tropin
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey Miles Ostrow
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Joseph C. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Terry
Represented By: Joshua Robert Levine
Represented By: Daniel Edward Tropin
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey Miles Ostrow
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Joseph C. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?