Guidecraft, Inc. v. OJCommerce, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Guidecraft, Inc.
Defendant: OJCommerce.com, Inc., OJCommerce, LLC and Naomi Home, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv62344
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 22 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Joseph Michael Delich, mailing date September 20, 2019, (pt)
September 20, 2019 Filing 21 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Kelly Ann Pressler, mailing date September 20, 2019, (pt)
September 20, 2019 Filing 20 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (jua)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 Case transferred in from New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-05529. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Guidecraft, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: On consent, the Clerk is to transfer this case to the Southern District of Florida. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/18/2019) (jca)
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Kelly A. Pressler, Esq. dated September 18, 2019 re: #14 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Joseph Delich dated 09/13/2019. . Document filed by Guidecraft, Inc.. (Pressler, Kelly)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #13 MOTION for Devin (Velvel) Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/16/2019) (jca)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Conference re Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Joseph Delich dated 09/13/2019. Document filed by Naomi Home, Inc., OJCommerce, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report and Recommendation)(Delich, Joseph)
September 13, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Devin (Velvel) Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17597666. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Devin (Velvel) Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17597666. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Naomi Home, Inc., OJCommerce, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Devin Freedman, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,. Granted. So Ordered. (Naomi Home, Inc. answer due 9/27/2019; OJCommerce, LLC answer due 9/27/2019; OJCommerce.com, Inc. answer due 9/27/2019.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/19/19) (yv)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Joseph Delich dated 08/14/2019. Document filed by Naomi Home, Inc., OJCommerce, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc..(Delich, Joseph)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Michael Delich on behalf of Naomi Home, Inc., OJCommerce, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. (Delich, Joseph)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Naomi Home, Inc. served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Guidecraft, Inc.. (Pressler, Kelly)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. OJCommerce.com, Inc. served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Guidecraft, Inc.. (Pressler, Kelly)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. OJCommerce, LLC served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Guidecraft, Inc.. (Pressler, Kelly)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Naomi Home, Inc., OJCommerce, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. (dnh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Pressler, Kelly)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OJ Commerce, LLC; OJCommerce.com, Inc.; Naomi Home, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Guidecraft, Inc.. (Pressler, Kelly)
June 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kelly Ann Pressler to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Attorney address field is blank. Court was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kelly Ann Pressler. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Orange; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pressler, Kelly)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OJ Commerce, LLC; OJCommerce.com, Inc.; Naomi Home, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Guidecraft, Inc.. (Pressler, Kelly) Modified on 6/14/2019 (pc).
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Naomi Home, Inc., OJCommerce, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17078261)Document filed by Guidecraft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pressler, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guidecraft, Inc. v. OJCommerce, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OJCommerce.com, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M. Delich
Represented By: Devin Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OJCommerce, LLC
Represented By: Joseph M. Delich
Represented By: Devin Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi Home, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M. Delich
Represented By: Devin Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guidecraft, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Ann Pressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?