Rosali v. Cubesmart L.P.
Plaintiff: Ivan Rosali
Defendant: Cubesmart L.P.
Case Number: 0:2019cv62474
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 36 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Demand for Jury Trial by Cubesmart L.P.. Responses due by 12/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garcia, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Filing 35 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Cubesmart L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Garcia, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #27 . See Second Amended Complaint, ECF No. #33 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa)
November 26, 2019 Filing 33 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cubesmart L.P., filed by Ivan Rosali.(Rosenbach, Marshall)
November 26, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by Ivan Rosali re #31 Order Striking (Rosenbach, Marshall)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER STRIKING #30 Second Amended Complaint filed by Ivan Rosali Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ra)
November 25, 2019 Filing 30 STRICKEN as per D.E #31 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ivan Rosali, filed by Ivan Rosali.(Rosenbach, Marshall) Modified Text on 11/26/2019 (ra).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot Motion to Remand, ECF No. #16 . See Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion, ECF No. #28 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa)
November 19, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 First MOTION to Remand filed by Ivan Rosali. (Rosenbach, Marshall)
November 12, 2019 Filing 27 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #24 Amended Complaint and Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Cubesmart L.P.. Responses due by 11/26/2019 (Garcia, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 First MOTION to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Cubesmart L.P.. Replies due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Garcia, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Louis Williams. Mediation Hearing set for 2/28/2020 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
November 8, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cubesmart L.P. filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Ivan Rosali.(Rosenbach, Marshall)
November 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Compliance with [DE 22] by Cubesmart L.P. (Garcia, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
November 6, 2019 Filing 21 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Ivan Rosali (Rosenbach, Marshall)
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Compliance of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF by Cubesmart L.P., Louis Williams. Attorney Michael Alexandar Garcia added to party Louis Williams(pty:med). (Garcia, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 Clerks Notice to Filer re #18 Notice (Other). Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the mediator. (mc)
November 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Cubesmart L.P. of Selecting Mediator (Garcia, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Defendant's expedited response by November 12, 2019, to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, ECF No. #16 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Remand by Ivan Rosali. (Rosenbach, Marshall)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss for reasons stated on the record. See ECF No. 14 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Motion Hearing held on 11/1/2019 on Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss, ECF No. #4 . Defendant's Motion, ECF No. #4 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall amend the Complaint, ECF No. [1-1], no later than November 8, 2019. Total time in court: 35 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Gerard Di Popolo, Marshall Rosenbach. Court Reporter: Glenda Powers, 305-523-5022 / Glenda_Powers@flsd.uscourts.gov. (laa)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's REPLY to Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Cubesmart L.P.. (Garcia, Michael)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring expedited Reply to Response in Opposition to Motion, ECF No. #11 . If Defendant elects to file a Reply to the Response in Opposition, ECF No. #11 , the Reply must be filed no later than October 31, 2019 at 6:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), and Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Ivan Rosali. Replies due by 11/1/2019. (Rosenbach, Marshall)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 (State Court Complaint), and Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement with Incorporated Memorandum of Law.( Responses due by 10/25/2019) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) Modified text on 10/22/2019 (asl).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2019., Discovery due by 6/2/2020., Expert Discovery due by 6/2/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 12/14/2019., Mediation Deadline 6/16/2020., In Limine Motions due by 6/24/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 6/24/2020., Motions due by 6/24/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/14/2020., Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 9/22/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 6/16/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Cubesmart L.P. (Garcia, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Cubesmart L.P. (Garcia, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss, ECF No. #4 . Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division 400 N. Miami Ave, Courtroom 10-2, Miami, Florida 33128, before Judge Beth Bloom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Compliance With Court Order [DE 3] by Cubesmart L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B) (Garcia, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), and Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Cubesmart L.P.. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Garcia, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on Post-Removal Procedures, re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Cubesmart L.P., and Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties( Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/25/2019) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12039587, filed by Cubesmart L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garcia, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosali v. Cubesmart L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Rosali
Represented By: Marshall Rosenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cubesmart L.P.
Represented By: Gerard Di Popolo
Represented By: Michael Alexandar Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?