Madrinan et al v. Loco 222 Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Enrique Madrinan and Deborah Davis
Defendant: J.E.Y. Hospitality Group LLC, Loco 222 Inc. and Oliva Oliva, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv62598
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Paul Gitkin on behalf of J.E.Y. Hospitality Group LLC, Loco 222 Inc.. Attorney James Paul Gitkin added to party J.E.Y. Hospitality Group LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Paul Gitkin added to party Loco 222 Inc.(pty:dft). (Gitkin, James)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Requiring Combined Responses. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 11/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (fc)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintffs' Counsel Verified Certificate of Prior ADA Filings at this facility by Deborah Davis, Enrique Madrinan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hirsh, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Enrique Madrinan, Deborah Davis. J.E.Y. Hospitality Group LLC served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Hirsh, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Enrique Madrinan, Deborah Davis. Loco 222 Inc. served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Hirsh, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Verified Certificate of Counsel Regarding Any Prior Filings Under the Americans With Disabilities Act. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 10/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (fc)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to J.E.Y. Hospitality Group LLC, Loco 222 Inc., Oliva Oliva, LLC. (pcs)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12077052, filed by Enrique Madrinan, Deborah Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Hirsh, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madrinan et al v. Loco 222 Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Madrinan
Represented By: Jeffrey Stephen Hirsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Stephen Hirsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.E.Y. Hospitality Group LLC
Represented By: James Paul Gitkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loco 222 Inc.
Represented By: James Paul Gitkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliva Oliva, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?