Boothe v. WM specialty Mortgage Specialty LLC et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Boothe
Defendant: Jane Doe, Does 1-100, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Any Public Bonds, JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC., Citi Residential Lending Inc., Shapiro, Fishman & Gache', LLP, WM specialty Mortgage Specialty LLC, Broward County Sheriff's Office, Ameriquest Mortgage Company, JOHN DOE, Law Firm Akerman LLP, Frenkel Lambert Weiss Weisman & Gordon LLP, PennyMac Holdings, LLC, Pennymac Loan Services, LLC, Florida Foreclosure Attorneys, PLLC, PMC REO Trust 2015-1 and Law Offices of Daniel C. Consuegra, P.L.
Case Number: 0:2019cv62685
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION TO DISMISS #17 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Shapiro, Fishman & Gache', LLP. Attorney Ileen Jill Cantor added to party Shapiro, Fishman & Gache', LLP(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/6/2020 (Cantor, Ileen)
December 23, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #17 Amended Complaint, , MOTION TO DISMISS #17 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 1/6/2020) by Akerman LLP, PennyMac Holdings, LLC. Attorney Eric Marc Levine added to party PennyMac Holdings, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Judgment), #2 Exhibit B (Certificiate of Sale), #3 Exhibit C (Objection to Sale), #4 Exhibit D (Order Overruling Objection), #5 Exhibit E (Certificiate of Title), #6 Exhibit F (Order Granting Writ))(Levine, Eric)
December 19, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Law Offices of Daniel C. Consuegra, P.L. served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (jao)
December 19, 2019 Filing 28 Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted as to Florida Foreclosure Attorneys, PLLC. (jao)
December 17, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Frenkel Lambert Weiss Weisman & Gordon LLP served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (jao)
December 13, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Akerman LLP served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (jao)
December 11, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Shapiro, Fishman & Gache', LLP served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (jao)
December 11, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Samuel Boothe. PennyMac Holdings, LLC served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (jas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Samuel Boothe. Ameriquest Mortgage Company served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (jas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Samuel Boothe. Citi Residential Lending Inc. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (jas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #17 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Samuel Boothe. JP Morgan Chase Bank served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (jas)
November 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Marc Levine on behalf of Akerman LLP. Attorney Eric Marc Levine added to party Akerman LLP(pty:dft). (Levine, Eric)
November 26, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #11 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Amended complaint and summonses sent to US Marshals for service. (pes) Modified text on 11/26/2019 (pes).
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Akerman LLP, Ameriquest Mortgage Company, Broward County Sheriff's Office, Citi Residential Lending Inc., Frenkel Lambert Weiss Weisman & Gordon LLP, JP Morgan Chase Bank, JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC., PMC REO Trust 2015-1, PennyMac Holdings, LLC, Pennymac Loan Services, LLC, Shapiro, Fishman & Gache', LLP, WM specialty Mortgage Specialty LLC, Law Offices of Daniel C. Consuegra, P.L., Florida Foreclosure Attorneys, PLLC. (pes)
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Akerman LLP, Ameriquest Mortgage Company, Broward County Sheriff's Office, Citi Residential Lending Inc., Does 1-100, Frenkel Lambert Weiss Weisman & Gordon LLP, JOHN DOE, JP Morgan Chase Bank, JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC., Jane Doe, Shapiro, Fishman & Gache', LLP, PennyMac Holdings, LLC, PMC REO Trust 2015-1, Pennymac Loan Services, LLC filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Samuel Boothe.(pes)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER: Pro se Plaintiff Samuel Boothe was ordered to amend his complaint and submit proposed summonses by November 18, 2019. When he did not timely to do so, the Court closed his case based on his failure to comply with #11 United States Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt's order. The Plaintiff says he has now submitted an amended complaint and the summonses. The Court will consider these filings timely submitted. Accordingly, the Court grants #14 the Plaintiffs motion to reopen his case. The Clerk is thus directed to reopen this case . This case remains referred to Judge Hunt for further proceedings as set forth in #4 the Court's order of referral. The Plaintiff is cautioned that further extensions of time in this case will only be granted upon a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kbe)
November 20, 2019 Filing 15 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Samuel Boothe to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: samuelboothe56@yahoo.com (jao)
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Reopen Case, MOTION to Accept Amended Complaint & Exhibits to Amended Complaint as Timely Filed by Samuel Boothe. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Summonses)(drz)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Compliance re #12 Order Dismissing Case, copy of order was mailed out via U.S. Mail by Deputy Clerk (jao)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #11 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Any pending motions are denied as moot, Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service Ordered and Summonses NOT provided for USM Service; Plaintiff ordered to provide Summonses for service by USM Service by 11/18/19 ; denying #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; denying #6 Motion for Permanent Injunction; granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. See attached document for full details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/8/2019. (sl00)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance re #9 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Copy of Order was mailed via U.S. Mail. By Deputy Clerk (jao)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Referring Case To Magistrate Judge For All Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS as to #1 Complaint filed by Samuel Boothe. (jao)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Add Defendant Pennymac Holdings, LLC and Equally to Correct and Update the Record of the Defendants List by Samuel Boothe. (Responses due by 11/14/2019) (jao)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Issuance of an EX PARTE Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Imposition of Permanent Injunction Pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure ("FED. R. CIV. P.") ( Responses due by 11/14/2019) by Samuel Boothe. (jao)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Compliance re #4 Order Referring Motion, copy of Order has been mailed out via U.S. Mail. (jao)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Samuel Boothe. (Motions referred to Judge Patrick M. Hunt.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samuel Boothe. (lk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (lk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Samuel Boothe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boothe v. WM specialty Mortgage Specialty LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Public Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMC Specialty Mortgage, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citi Residential Lending Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro, Fishman & Gache', LLP
Represented By: Ileen Jill Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WM specialty Mortgage Specialty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broward County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriquest Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Firm Akerman LLP
Represented By: Eric Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frenkel Lambert Weiss Weisman & Gordon LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Eric Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Foreclosure Attorneys, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMC REO Trust 2015-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Daniel C. Consuegra, P.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Boothe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?