All Commercial Floors, Inc. v. Forbo Flooring, Inc.
Plaintiff: All Commercial Floors, Inc.
Defendant: Forbo Flooring, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv62741
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Referring Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added John J. Upchurch as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 1/24/2020 at 9:00 a.m.. (Graham, Robert)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Forbo Flooring, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Forbo Flooring North America, Corporate Parent The Forbo Group for Forbo Flooring, Inc. (Rothberg, Barry)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ail)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. No discovery motions shall be filed with the Court unless specifically authorized by Order. In the event a discovery dispute does arise, counsel are instructed to meet and confer in a good faith attempt to resolve the dispute. If, after conferring, the parties cannot resolve their discovery dispute, the movant must seek relief within 14 days after the grounds for relief occur by contacting Chambers (954-769-5450) and scheduling a discovery hearing. The movant shall have first conferred with opposing counsel and obtained three alternative dates and times that both counsel are available for a hearing. The attorney or other person with knowledge who telephones the Court shall have the following information: (a) the nature of the discovery dispute; (b) the efforts made to confer with opposing counsel; and (c) three agreed upon dates for a hearing. The Court will then set the matter for hearing and order the parties to submit a joint status report on the issues. Where there has been a complete failure to respond to discovery, and where good faith efforts have been made (without success) to obtain that discovery, counsel need not obtain agreed upon dates, but shall so inform the Court telephonically of the issue, and the Court will set the matter for hearing. Finally, when the parties have stipulated to the entry of an order, such as a stipulated confidentiality order, the parties shall not file a motion for entry of the stipulated order. Instead, counsel shall email to Chambers (seltzer@flsd.uscourts.gov) a copy of the proposed stipulated order in Word or WordPerfect format, with a statement that the parties have agreed to entry of the proposed order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 12/6/2019. (osd)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz, Calendar Call set for 9/22/2020 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for Discovery Matters. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 6/8/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 12/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (btr) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Forbo Flooring, Inc. (Rothberg, Barry)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by All Commercial Floors, Inc. (Graham, Robert)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by All Commercial Floors, Inc. (Graham, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM of Law re #7 Response in Opposition to Motion, in Reply to All Commercial Floors, Inc.'s Opposition to Dismiss the Complaint by Forbo Flooring, Inc.. (Rothberg, Barry)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) filed by All Commercial Floors, Inc.. Replies due by 11/29/2019. (Graham, Robert)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 11/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (btr)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT (Removal) by Forbo Flooring, Inc. (Rothberg, Barry)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by Forbo Flooring, Inc.. Responses due by 11/22/2019 (Rothberg, Barry)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of Court-Mandated Requirements. Removal Status Report due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 11/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (btr)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12120704, filed by Forbo Flooring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Rothberg, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All Commercial Floors, Inc. v. Forbo Flooring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Commercial Floors, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Craig Graham, Jr.
Represented By: Alberta L. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forbo Flooring, Inc.
Represented By: Barry Lawrence Rothberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?