Subil v. Inch
Plaintiff: David Subil
Defendant: Mark Inch
Case Number: 0:2019cv62757
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #10 Order to Show Cause, by David Subil. (mee)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeanine Marie Germanowicz on behalf of Mark Inch. Attorney Jeanine Marie Germanowicz added to party Mark Inch(pty:dft). (Germanowicz, Jeanine)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254. On or before forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order Respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this Petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark Inch filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by David Subil.(mee)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 11/26/2019 in the amount of $5.00, receipt number FLS100198895. (asz)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 12/13/2019. Motions due by 12/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE NON-COMPLIANCE AND FOR AMENDED PETITION. On or before December 13, 2019, Petitioner shall file an amended 2254 petition that complies with the applicable rules of procedure set forth in this order, and that cures the pleading deficiencies identified in this order., ( Amended Complaint due by 12/13/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 2254 Complaint Form) (fbn)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by David Subil. (drz)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 APPENDIX of Exhibits to #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by David Subil (drz)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (drz)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 not paid/no ifp filed, filed by David Subil.(drz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #1 List of filings) (drz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Subil v. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Inch
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Represented By: Jeanine Marie Germanowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Subil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?