Pennington v. Inch
Plaintiff: Mark Pennington
Defendant: Mark Inch
Case Number: 0:2019cv62761
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SECOND ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 1/27/2020. Motions due by 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Mark Inch re #7 Order to Show Cause, #10 Response to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Transcripts Motion on Child Hearsay) (Surber, Melanie)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Mark Inch of Filing Transcripts (Attachments: #1 Transcripts) (Surber, Melanie)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 APPENDIX by Mark Inch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Surber, Melanie)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Mark Inch. (Surber, Melanie)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Petitioner's Expected Inability to Respond to the Court by Mark Pennington (ail)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Dale Surber on behalf of Mark Inch. Attorney Melanie Dale Surber added to party Mark Inch(pty:dft). (Surber, Melanie)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LIMITED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254. On or before forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order, Respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this Petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER deferring ruling on #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. In the Motion, Petitioner states that he is still waiting to receive his six-month inmate account statement from the prison. Such a statement is required to proceed in forma pauperis. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), (b). Petitioner is hereby ORDERED to submit his six-month account statement on or before December 11, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/8/2019. (ac01)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay and Abeyance by Mark Pennington. Responses due by 11/19/2019 (jao)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Pennington. (jao)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jao)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Mark Pennington.(jao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennington v. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Inch
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Represented By: Melanie Dale Surber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?