Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Caviar Exclusive, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Body Electric Music, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Fifth of March Music, Cotillion Music, Inc., Merjoda Music, Inc., Mary Bono As Trustee of the Bono Collection Trust, Lost Boys Music and Warner Tamerlane Publishing Corp
Defendant: Steven Shtivelman, Caviar Exclusive, LLC and Caviar Exclusive, LLC doing business as Gatsby's Joint
Case Number: 0:2019cv62786
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Administratively Closing Case) (ls)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Administratively Closing Case upon #6 Notice of Settlement; Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal or Stipulation of Dismissal due 1/6/2020; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 12/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Body Electric Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Fifth of March Music, Lost Boys Music, Mary Bono As Trustee of the Bono Collection Trust, Merjoda Music, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner Tamerlane Publishing Corp (Messa, Zachary)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Discovery Matters To Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 11/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Via U.S. mail) (amb)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Caviar Exclusive, LLC, Steven Shtivelman. (amb)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caviar Exclusive, LLC, Steven Shtivelman. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12131320, filed by Mary Bono As Trustee of the Bono Collection Trust, Fifth of March Music, Lost Boys Music, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Warner Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Body Electric Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Merjoda Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) Summons Caviar Exclusive, LLC, #4 Summon(s) Summons Steven Shtivelman)(Messa, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Caviar Exclusive, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Body Electric Music
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fifth of March Music
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotillion Music, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merjoda Music, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Bono As Trustee of the Bono Collection Trust
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lost Boys Music
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Tamerlane Publishing Corp
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Shtivelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caviar Exclusive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caviar Exclusive, LLC doing business as Gatsby's Joint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?