MGE Studios Productions, LLC v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: MGE Studios Productions, LLC
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kenneth T Cuccinelli and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 0:2019cv62830
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF FINAL DISMISSAL. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by MGE Studios Productions, LLC (Kurzban, Ira)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of interested parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements. Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/31/2020 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MGE Studios Productions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MG Estudio e Producoes de Filmes Ltda. for MGE Studios Productions, LLC (Kurzban, Ira)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Diaz on behalf of U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft). (Diaz, Natalie)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ail)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth T Cuccinelli, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12145671, filed by MGE Studios Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Kurzban, Ira)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MGE Studios Productions, LLC v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MGE Studios Productions, LLC
Represented By: Ira Jay Kurzban
Represented By: John Patrick Pratt
Represented By: Edward Fortunato Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?