OJ Commerce LLC v. Home City Inc
Plaintiff: OJ Commerce LLC
Defendant: Home City Inc
Case Number: 0:2019cv62974
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by OJ Commerce LLC (Hecht, Shlomo)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES on or before February 4, 2020. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 1/15/2020. (mhn)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Home City Inc. (Stok, Robert)
December 26, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Home City Inc response due 1/14/2020. (mhn)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's response/answer is due on or before January 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 12/26/2019. (mhn)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint by Home City Inc. Responses due by 1/6/2020 (Stok, Robert)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert A. Stok on behalf of Home City Inc. Attorney Robert A. Stok added to party Home City Inc(pty:dft). (Stok, Robert)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Home City Inc. (drz)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Home City Inc. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12198100, filed by OJ Commerce LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(Hecht, Shlomo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OJ Commerce LLC v. Home City Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home City Inc
Represented By: Robert A. Stok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OJ Commerce LLC
Represented By: Shlomo Y Hecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?