Wilmore v. Fleischman et al
Plaintiff: Herve Wilmore, Jr
Defendant: Fleischman & Fleischman, P.A., Attorney at Law, Sidney Z Fleischman and Jack A Fleischman
Case Number: 0:2019cv63013
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
2 Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint filed by Herve Wilmore, Jr; Recommending that Plaintiff's Complaint ECF No. #1 be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Objections to R&R due by 1/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 1/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Raag Singhal for all further proceedings, Judge Marcia G. Cooke no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (yar)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #13 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server. Plaintiff will not receive summonses for service and Plaintiff may not serve the Complaint until it has been screened and allowed to proceed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Second, Plaintiff need not use CM/ECF to file his pleadings because the Court's previous Order that Plaintiff refers to [ECF No. 6], was vacated. [See ECF No. 9]. The Undersigned entered a new Order of Instructions, which states in part that Plaintiff should send copies of all pleadings to the Clerk of Court. [See ECF No. 11, p. 3]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/27/2019. (ac01)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Court for Appointment of Special Process Server by Herve Wilmore, Jr. Responses due by 1/9/2020 (ebz)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND ESTABLISHING A DEBT OF $350. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. #3 is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case. Plaintiff owes the United States a debt of $350.00 which must be paid to the Clerk of the Court as funds become available. The jail/prison having custody of Plaintiff must make payments from the prisoners account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $25.00 until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/13/2019) (fbn).
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt no longer assigned as referral judge in case. Motions referred to Judge Lisette M. Reid. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/13/2019. (kou)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED Order to Vacate re #6 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge 7 Order Referring Motion to Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/13/2019. (kou)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters per DE #6 . Motions referred to Judge Patrick M. Hunt. (vjk)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 VACATED per DE# 9 , ENDORSED ORDER REFERRING #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal to Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/9/2019. (kou) Modified text on 12/13/2019 (jas).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 VACATED per DE# 9 , ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 02/07/2020. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou) Modified text on 12/13/2019 (jas).
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt (asl)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment,,. Incorrect Magistrate Judge Selected; Corrected by the Clerk. (asl)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal by Herve Wilmore, Jr. (mee)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee) Modified Magistrate Judge Assignment and docket text on 12/9/2019 (asl).
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332 (a)(1) and 28 U.S.C. 1391 (b)(2) against Jack A Fleischman, Sidney Z Fleischman, Fleischman & Fleischman, P.A., Attorney at Law. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Herve Wilmore, Jr.(mee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmore v. Fleischman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleischman & Fleischman, P.A., Attorney at Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney Z Fleischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack A Fleischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herve Wilmore, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?