Tomlinson v. Southwest Airlines Company
Plaintiff: Juliene Jeane Tomlinson
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv63087
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jared M Strauss
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 18 Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) - 2020-5 to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer no longer assigned to case. (jmd)
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by dominic brandy . Attorney Dominic L. Brandy added to party dominic brandy(pty:med). (Brandy, Dominic)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION. Mediation Hearing set for 7/1/2020 at 10:00 AM before Dominic Brandy. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Southwest Airlines Company of Filing Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation) (Baumgarten, Maurice)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Counts II and III of the Complaint are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. No discovery motions shall be filed with the Court unless specifically authorized by Order. In the event a discovery dispute does arise, counsel are instructed to meet and confer in a good faith attempt to resolve the dispute. If, after conferring, the parties cannot resolve their discovery dispute, the movant must seek relief within 14 days after the grounds for relief occur by contacting Chambers (954-769-5450) and scheduling a discovery hearing. The movant shall have first conferred with opposing counsel and obtained three alternative dates and times that both counsel are available for a hearing. The attorney or other person with knowledge who telephones the Court shall have the following information: (a) the nature of the discovery dispute; (b) the efforts made to confer with opposing counsel; and (c) three agreed upon dates for a hearing. The Court will then set the matter for hearing and order the parties to submit a joint status report on the issues. Where there has been a complete failure to respond to discovery, and where good faith efforts have been made (without success) to obtain that discovery, counsel need not obtain agreed upon dates, but shall so inform the Court telephonically of the issue, and the Court will set the matter for hearing. Finally, when the parties have stipulated to the entry of an order, such as a stipulated confidentiality order, the parties shall not file a motion for entry of the stipulated order. Instead, counsel shall email to Chambers (seltzer@flsd.uscourts.gov) a copy of the proposed stipulated order in Word or WordPerfect format, with a statement that the parties have agreed to entry of the proposed order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 12/27/2019. (osd)
December 26, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT (on Removal) by Southwest Airlines Company (Baumgarten, Maurice)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Defendant, Southwest Airlines Company, shall file a removal status report in compliance with the December 16, 2019 Order [ECF No. 3] by December 27, 2019. Failure to comply will result in remand without further notice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 10/20/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 7/6/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for all Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Southwest Airlines Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baumgarten, Maurice)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Juliene Jeane Tomlinson (Goldstein, Zeb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southwest Airlines Company (Baumgarten, Maurice)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Southwest Airlines Company. (Baumgarten, Maurice)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Southwest Airlines Company. Responses due by 1/2/2020 (Baumgarten, Maurice)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Removal Status Report due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Juliene Jeane Tomlinson, as Personal Representative of Johnny Hardge) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12225598, filed by Southwest Airlines Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit B - Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit C - Reiterated Demand)(Baumgarten, Maurice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomlinson v. Southwest Airlines Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliene Jeane Tomlinson
Represented By: Zeb Israel Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Company
Represented By: Maurice Jay Baumgarten
Represented By: Roberto A. Torricella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?