Holtz v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Marcia Holtz
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. doing business as Chase Card Services
Case Number: 0:2019cv63088
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendant's Answer filed on February 4, 2020 is hereby deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/6/2020. (rrt)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Taormina, Alisa)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Taormina, Alisa)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Attorney Alisa M Taormina added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taormina, Alisa)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES, referring case to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Marcia Holtz. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. (Ginsburg, Amy)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (pcs)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. d/b/a Chase Card Services. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12226094, filed by Marcia Holtz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Ginsburg, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holtz v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Holtz
Represented By: Amy Lynn Bennecoff Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alisa M Taormina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. doing business as Chase Card Services
Represented By: Alisa M Taormina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?