Sporea v. Regions Bank N.A.
Appellant: Peter Sporea
Appellee: Regions Bank N.A.
Case Number: 0:2020cv60040
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION and Notice of Clarification as Mistake, Inadvertence, Surprise, or Excusable Neglect took Place per Rule 60(b)(1) Re: [DE 17] Paperless Order by Peter Sporea. Responses due by 3/9/2020 (ar2)
February 19, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED/NEW Notice of Appeal as to #11 Bankruptcy Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Appeal by Peter Sporea. FILING FEE: (NOT PAID). (apz) Modified text on 2/20/2020 (jc).
February 18, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE to the Court Re: Timely Designation of Sealed Documents Rule 8009(a)(1)(A) by Peter Sporea (ar2)
February 18, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration Re: [DE 17] Paperless Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Order of Sale, by Peter Sporea. (ar2)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #15 Motion & Request to Court & Judge to Stand & Support; denying as moot #15 Motion for Reconsideration. This appeal has been dismissed. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/10/2020. (vve)
February 6, 2020 Filing 16 Motion and Notice of Re-consideration on Timely Designation of Sealed Documents Rule 8009(a)(1)(A) by Peter Sporea. (cbr)
February 6, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION & Request to Court & Judge to Stand & Support, MOTION & Notice of Redemption of Sale, MOTION on Un-Authorized Sale, MOTION & Notice of Redemption, and MOTION on Un_Authorized Sale on-line by Mistake by Peter Sporea. (ar2)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying as moot #5 Updated & Amended Emergency Motion for Appellant; Denying as moot #7 Motion to Allow Redeem of Sale; Denying as moot #8 Emergency Motion for Appellant to Allow Redeem Sale; and Denying as moot #12 Emergency Second Motion for Cancelled Sale. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
January 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Designation by Peter Sporea (ar2)
January 27, 2020 Filing 12 EMERGENCY SECOND MOTION for Cancelled Sale by Peter Sporea. (ar2)
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 Bankruptcy Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Appeal for Failure by Appellant(s) to Timely File Designation or Statement of Issues. Signed by John K. Olson, Bankruptcy Judge, on 1/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (jua)
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regions Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Regions Financial Corp. for Regions Bank N.A. (Yates, Brian)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Peter Sporea (ar2)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION for of Appellant to Allow Redeem Sale by Peter Sporea. (cds)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Anow Redeem of Sale by Peter Sporea. (ar2)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 UPDATED & AMENDED EMERGENCY MOTION for Appellant by Peter Sporea. (ar2)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jua)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Peter Sporea (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(smd)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 19-26418-JKO, filed by Peter Sporea.(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sporea v. Regions Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Peter Sporea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Regions Bank N.A.
Represented By: Brian P Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?