Duenas-Burgos et al v. Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Petitioner: Maricel Ramos-Negron and Alvaro Roberto Duenas-Burgos
Respondent: Field Office Director, Orlando Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Case Number: 0:2020cv60321
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Patrick M Hunt
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court hereby DISMISSES the above-styled case without prejudice. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
February 26, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT Stipulation of Dismissal by Alvaro Roberto Duenas-Burgos and Maricel Ramos-Negron. (Prada, Mark) Text Modified on 2/28/2020. (scn)
February 26, 2020 Filing 12 (CORRECT VERSION AT DE#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal via Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Alvaro Roberto Duenas-Burgos, Maricel Ramos-Negron (Prada, Mark) Text Modified on 2/28/2020. (scn)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File/Motion to Continue. The petitioners shall file their reply brief on or before February 28, 2020. The hearing, currently set for February 25, 2020, is continued until March 3, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in the Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 2/21/2020. (hhr)
February 21, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2020 at 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. SEE DE 11 PAPERLESS ORDER (ail)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #8 Order,, Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (re: petitioners' response brief), Unopposed MOTION to Continue hearing set for February 25, 2020 ( Responses due by 3/5/2020) by Alvaro Roberto Duenas-Burgos, Maricel Ramos-Negron. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prada, Mark)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 Respondents' RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director, Orlando Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Petri, Steven)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #5 Emergency Motion for Stay of Removal. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2020 at 10:30 a.m. in the Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven R. Petri on behalf of Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director, Orlando Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney Steven R. Petri added to party Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:res), Attorney Steven R. Petri added to party Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:res), Attorney Steven R. Petri added to party Acting Secretary of Homeland Security(pty:res), Attorney Steven R. Petri added to party Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:res), Attorney Steven R. Petri added to party Field Office Director, Orlando Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:res). (Petri, Steven)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING #5 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included for Stay of Removal filed by Maricel Ramos-Negron, Alvaro Roberto Duenas-Burgos. Motion referred to Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/14/2020. (jz00)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included for Stay of Removal by Alvaro Roberto Duenas-Burgos, Maricel Ramos-Negron. Responses due by 2/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Camarena Opinion (CA11), #2 Certification of Emergency)(Prada, Mark)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Field Office Director, Orlando Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pcs)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. (pcs)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12450938, filed by Alvaro Roberto Duenas-Burgos, Maricel Ramos-Negron. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Notice of Related Cases, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s))(Prada, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duenas-Burgos et al v. Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Field Office Director, Orlando Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Steven R. Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Steven R. Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Steven R. Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Steven R. Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Steven R. Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maricel Ramos-Negron
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alvaro Roberto Duenas-Burgos
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?